Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Lee H Rosenthal
Case #: 4:21-cv-03088
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2021
Last checked: Monday Mar 21, 2022 4:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Alaxco International
1021 Sydnor Street
Houston, TX 77020
Defendant
Heritier Byishimo
1021 Sydnor Street
Houston, TX 77020
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
1999 Bryan Street
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Jeremy Lee Simmons
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Jennifer Tomsen
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marco Garcia
Represented By
Jeremy Lee Simmons
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co.
3400 Carlisle Street Suite 200 3400 Carlisle Street, Suite 200
Dallas, TX 75204
Represented By
Xavier M. Bailliard
Kranjac Tripodi & Partners LP
contact info
John David Blakley
Dunn Sheehan LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 11 2022
ee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered: Chase Bank's motion to dismiss is granted, (Docket Entry No. 10). The claims against Chase Bank are dismissed without prejudice. Taya may amend its complaint, consistent with Rule 11, no later than January 25, 2022. Taya must also file a written statement to show cause, by no later than January 25, 2022, for why Taya's claims against Alaxco and Byishimo should not be dismissed for failure to serve the defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If Taya does not respond adequately by that date, the court will dismiss this case without further notice. The initial conference set for January 14 is canceled and will be reset by separate notice. (Signed by Chief Judge L
GPO Apr 13 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: Chase Bank and Garcia's motion to dismiss is granted. (Docket Entry No. 31). The claims against Chase Bank and Garcia are dismissed with prejudice. Tayas claims against Byishimo are also dismissed. On January 25, 2022, Taya asked this court for 30 days to serve Byishimo, after failing to serve him in the year and a half since this case was filed. The 30 days have long passed, and Taya has not served Byishimo. Taya's claims against Byishimo are dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.