Stossel v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-07385 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 21, 2022 1:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Climate Feedback
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Facebook Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Science Feedback
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Stossel
|
Represented By
|
![]() Order granting 27 50 Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2022) |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
83 | 83
![]() ORDER Directing Clerk to Close Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/3/2023. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
82 | 82
![]() ORDER AND MANDATE of USCA as to71 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by John Stossel "Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties this appeal isvoluntarily dismissed.The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal.A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
81 | 81
![]() STIPULATION filed by John Stossel. (Baughman, Krista) |