Davis v. Sanofi, S.A. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81805 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 22, 2022 4:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi, S.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Davis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Wed 06/08 3:35 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASE. Case is Deconsolidated from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case remains closed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Thu 05/19 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT Prejudice by Lawrence Davis (Carlson, Craig) |
|
Monday, October 04, 2021 | ||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 10/04 10:50 AM
MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81805-RLR Davis v. Sanofi, S.A. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) |
||
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
order
Administrative Order
Wed 09/29 10:41 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) | |
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/23 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Sanofi SA, Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15037958, filed by Lawrence Davis.(Carlson, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 09/23 2:49 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) |