California Central District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00442
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2021
Last checked: Friday Sep 24, 2021 12:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Saeed Torab Abtahi (2)
Defendant
Abbas Amin (3)
Defendant
Shantia Chupra (8)
Defendant
Mojtaba Dehghani (5)
Defendant
Khalil Henareh (10)
Defendant
Salim Henareh (9)
Defendant
Reza Karimi (7)
Defendant
Sara Sabri (6)
Defendant
Issa Shayegh (4)
Defendant
Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William Rollins
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/24/2021 1:45 AM PDT
Friday, October 16, 2020
1 1 48 pgs COMPLAINT filed as to Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani, Saeed Torab Abtahi, Abbas Amin, Issa Shayegh, Mojtaba Dehghani, Sara Sabri, Reza Karimi, Shantia Chupra, Salim Henareh, Khalil Henareh Approved by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver as to Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani (1), Saeed Torab Abtahi (2), Abbas Amin (3), Issa Shayegh (4), Mojtaba Dehghani (5), Sara Sabri (6), Reza Karimi (7), Shantia Chupra (8), Salim Henareh (9), Khalil Henareh (10). (cio) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/24/2021) (mhe). Modified on 3/24/2021 (mhe). (mhe). [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/24/2021) COMPLAINT
12 12 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Saeed Torab Abtahi (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
14 14 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Abbas Amin (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Issa Shayegh (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Mojtaba Dehghani (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
17 17 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Sara Sabri (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Reza Karimi (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Shantia Chupra (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
20 20 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Salim Henareh (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
21 21 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Khalil Henareh (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
22 22 GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani, Saeed Torab Abtahi, Abbas Amin, Issa Shayegh, Mojtaba Dehghani, Sara Sabri, Reza Karimi, Shantia Chupra, Salim Henareh, Khalil Henareh. (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting22 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Document as to Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani (1), Saeed Torab Abtahi (2), Abbas Amin (3), Issa Shayegh (4), Mojtaba Dehghani (5), Sara Sabri (6), Reza Karimi (7), Shantia Chupra (8), Salim Henareh (9), Khalil Henareh (10) (cio) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
24 24 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Unseal COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT, EXHIBIT 1, AND ARREST WARRANTS Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani. (Rollins, William) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 22, 2021
25 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: granting24 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Unseal Document re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Unseal COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT, EXHIBIT 1, AND ARREST WARRANTS 24 as to Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani (1) (mhe) [2:20-mj-05033-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
26 26 22 pgs INDICTMENT Filed as to Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani (1) count(s) 1, Saeed Torab Abtahi (2) count(s) 1, Abbas Amin (3) count(s) 1, Issa Shayegh (4) count(s) 1, Mojtaba Dehghani (5) count(s) 1, Sara Sabri (6) count(s) 1, Reza Karimi (7) count(s) 1, Shantia Chupra (8) count(s) 1, Salim Henareh (9) count(s) 1, Khalil Henareh (10) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani; defendants Year of Birth: 1976 (mhe)
Related: [-]
28 28 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Saeed Torab Abtahi (mhe)
Related: [-]
29 29 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Abbas Amin (mhe)
Related: [-]
30 30 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Issa Shayegh (mhe)
Related: [-]
31 31 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Mojtaba Dehghani (mhe)
Related: [-]
32 32 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Sara Sabri (mhe)
Related: [-]
33 33 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Reza Karimi (mhe)
Related: [-]
34 34 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Shantia Chupra (mhe)
Related: [-]
35 35 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Salim Henareh (mhe)
Related: [-]
36 36 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA William M Rollins as to Defendant Khalil Henareh (mhe)
Related: [-]
46 46 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani (mhe)
Related: [-]
47 47 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Saeed Torab Abtahi (mhe)
Related: [-]
48 48 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Abbas Amin (mhe)
Related: [-]
49 49 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Issa Shayegh (mhe)
Related: [-]
50 50 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Mojtaba Dehghani (mhe)
Related: [-]
51 51 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Sara Sabri (mhe)
Related: [-]
52 52 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Reza Karimi (mhe)
Related: [-]
53 53 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Shantia Chupra (mhe)
Related: [-]
54 54 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Salim Henareh (mhe)
Related: [-]
55 55 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Khalil Henareh (mhe)
Related: [-]
56 56 1 pgs NOTICE TO COURT OF COMPLEX CASE filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani, Saeed Torab Abtahi, Abbas Amin, Issa Shayegh, Mojtaba Dehghani, Sara Sabri, Reza Karimi, Shantia Chupra, Salim Henareh, Khalil Henareh. (mhe)
Related: [-]
58 58 1 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (mhe)
Related: [-]
59 59 1 pgs NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Seyed Ziaeddin Taheri Zangakani, Saeed Torab Abtahi, Abbas Amin, Issa Shayegh, Mojtaba Dehghani, Sara Sabri, Reza Karimi, Shantia Chupra, Salim Henareh, Khalil Henareh Related Case(s): CV 21-2438 PA (mhe)
Related: [-]