Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:21-cr-01812
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2021
Last checked: Friday Sep 24, 2021 2:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Rey David Rodriguez-Campos (1)
Represented By
Abel Guerrero
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew James Hannon Redavid, Jr
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/24/2021 3:08 AM CDT
Saturday, August 28, 2021
Arrest of Rey David Rodriguez-Campos, filed. (SandraSilva, 7) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 29, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 8/30/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (stgarciadi, 7) (lelizondo, 7). [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Criminal Complaint as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos held on 8/30/2021. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Government moves for temporary detention and continuance to prepare for detention hearing. Court grants. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 9/2/2021 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S. Medrano. Deft consents to appear by video conference. Defendant confirms Financial Affidavit information is accurate. The Court advised Defendant of the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally reminded the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; written order to follow. Appearances: Robert Guerra, AUSA. (PTS: Marina Garza) (ERO: Amy Sanchez) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Priscilla M. Pastor/not used) (DUSM: David Herrera) Deft remanded to custody. (caramirezadi, 7) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Matthew James Hannon Redavid, Jr appearing for USA, filed Related [+] [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-] david, Matthew
2 2 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Rey David Rodriguez-Campos, filed. [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos, filed.(SandraSilva, 7) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Rey David Rodriguez-Campos (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (caramirezadi, 7) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 9/2/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (caramirezadi, 7) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (caramirezadi, 7) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
7 7 MOTION for Waiver of Preliminary and Detetnion Hearings by Rey David Rodriguez-Campos, filed.(Taylor, Michelle) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 ORDER granting7 Motion for Waiver of Preliminary and Detetnion Hearings as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano.) Parties notified.(YeseniaIbarra, 7) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (YeseniaIbarra, 7) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
10 10 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos, filed. (dsolis, 7) [7:21-mj-01867]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
11 11 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos (1) count(s) 1, filed. (lelizondoadi, 7) (lelizondo, 7).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/22/2021) Unredacted attachment
12 12 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Rey David Rodriguez-Campos, filed.(lelizondoadi, 7)
Related: [-]