Valancourt Books, LLC v. Merrick Garland, et al
Original Case: 1:18-cv-01922
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cvus-05203 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2024 3:58 PM EST |
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Zvi S. Rosen
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Brian L. Frye
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Association of American Publishers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Niskanen Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
American Library Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Association of College and Research Libraries
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Association of Research Libraries
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Shira Perlmutter, in her official capacity as the Register of Copyrights of the U.S. Copyright Office
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Valancourt Books, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/06/2024 3:58 PM EST |
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 21-5203 | ||
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1915364] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01922-ABJ filed by Valancourt Books, LLC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5203 21-5203 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1915366] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/25/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/25/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/25/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/25/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/25/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 10/25/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/25/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/25/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/08/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/25/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/25/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/25/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/08/2021 21-5203 |