Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:21-bk-19272
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2021
Claims Deadline:Dec 03, 2021
Terminated:Apr 06, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Mar 02, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
A&E Adventures LLC
5000 Oaks Rd Unit H
Miami, FL 33143
Represented By
James C. Moon, Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Friday, March 31, 2023
161 161 6 pgs order Order from District Court re: Appeal Fri 03/31 3:50 PM
Final Order By District Court Judge Darrin P. Gayles, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 21-cv-24432-DPG , AFFIRMING Related [+]. See attached document for full details . (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] 69 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay