Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Christopher A Boyko
Case #: 1:21-cv-01819
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2021
Terminated:Sep 28, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 23, 2022 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Kimberly Lanae Hall
Critchfield, Critchfield & Johnston - Wooster
contact info
J. Douglas Drushal
Critchfield, Critchfield & Johnston
contact info
Steven E Seasly
Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Ricky McClenton
Represented By
Frederick M. Bean
Spitz Law
contact info
Taurean J. Shattuck
Spitz Law
contact info
David E. Byrnes
Spitz Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 12/21 3:02 PM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shattuck, Taurean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/28 9:46 AM
Order of Case Dismissal. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/28/2022. (L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Wed 08/24 9:55 AM
Order [non-document] The parties have advised the Court that this matter has been resolved. Therefore, the Settlement Conference scheduled for Monday, August 29, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. is cancelled. A notice of dismissal shall be filed no later than September 26, 2022 or the Court will put on its own entry. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/24/2022. (L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Mon 06/13 4:16 PM
Order [non-document]granting Parties Joint14 Motion to Extend Deadlines, to extend discovery deadline to August 26, 2022 and the settlement conference to August 29, 2022 at 2:00. No further extensions will be allowed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/13/2022.(L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
14 14 motion Extension (of deadlines) Fri 06/10 6:52 PM
Motion for extension of Discovery Cutoff Deadline and Settlement Conference Date until Discovery Cutoff Deadline through August 26, 2022 and Settlement Conference Date to August 29, 2022 filed by Defendant Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc.. (Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
13 13 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 04/29 3:23 PM
Attorney Appearance by Julia L. Denmeade filed by on behalf of Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc.. (Denmeade, Julia)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
12 12 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Fri 01/14 8:51 PM
Initial Disclosures filed by Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc.. (Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
11 11 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/29 2:59 PM
Standing Order for Settlement Conferences. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/29/21. (S,HR)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Wed 12/29 2:54 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko.Telephonic Case Management Conference held 12/29/21. Case designated Standard Track. Deadline for amending or adding parties is January 14, 2022. Fact Discovery cut-off is June 27, 2022. Settlement Conference is set for June 30, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Conference will take place at the Howard M. Metzenbaum US Courthouse, East Chambers - Room 328, 201 Superior Avenue, Cleveland, OH 44114. Lead counsel and all parties with full authority are required to attend and comply with the Court's Standing Settlement Conference Order. If the matter does not resolve, the Court will set further dates. Time: 10 minutes. (S,HR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
10 10 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 12/23 3:03 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Ricky McClenton. (Bean, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
9 9 notice Attorney Substitution (atty event) Wed 12/08 2:14 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney J. Douglas Drushal and Kimberly L. Hall and adding attorney Steven E Seasly filed by on behalf of Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc.. (Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Order Tue 12/07 1:38 PM
Order [non-document] continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference now set for 12/29/2021 at 2:30 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the conference call. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/7/21. (S,HR)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
8 8 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Mon 11/01 12:03 PM
Notice of Case Management Conference with telephonic case management conference to be held on 12/22/21 at 2:30 PM before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the conference call. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/1/21.(S,HR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Report of Parties Planning Meeting,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Consent Packet
Monday, October 25, 2021
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/25 2:47 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc.. (Drushal, J.)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 10/25 11:26 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc.. (Drushal, J.)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 10/25 11:24 AM
Attorney Appearance by J. Douglas Drushal filed by on behalf of Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc.. (Drushal, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
4 4 oth_evt Certified Mail Receipt Thu 10/07 2:46 PM
Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc. and delivery date unknown, status unavailable on USPS website. Related document(s)2 . (S,SR)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Thu 10/07 2:41 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc. on 10/4/2021, filed on behalf of Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc. Related document(s)2 . (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
oth_evt Service by Clerk Thu 09/30 3:13 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7019 0700 0001 8423 9968. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Service by Clerk Thu 09/30 3:15 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc. c/o CC&J Agents, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7019 0700 0001 8423 9951. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 09/27 7:43 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc. (two addresses). (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 09/27 7:37 AM
Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 09/27 7:38 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/24 4:05 PM
Complaint with jury demand For Damages and Reinstatement against Tahoma Engineered Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11052081.. Filed by Ricky McClenton. (Shattuck, Taurean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons X2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Right to Sue X2