Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:21-cv-01086
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2021
Terminated:Dec 09, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 23, 2022 4:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Scott Boyer
Represented By
Matthew W Ray
Loewinsohn Flegle Simon Deary LLP
contact info
Douglas E Brayley
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Samuel Goodwin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sheila Hewitt
Represented By
Matthew W Ray
Loewinsohn Flegle Simon Deary LLP
contact info
Douglas E Brayley
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Samuel Goodwin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Hoban
Represented By
Matthew W Ray
Loewinsohn Flegle Simon Deary LLP
contact info
Douglas E Brayley
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Samuel Goodwin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sean Leber
Represented By
Matthew W Ray
Loewinsohn Flegle Simon Deary LLP
contact info
Douglas E Brayley
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Samuel Goodwin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steven Mitchell
Represented By
Matthew W Ray
Loewinsohn Flegle Simon Deary LLP
contact info
Douglas E Brayley
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Samuel Goodwin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warren Patterson
Represented By
Matthew W Ray
Loewinsohn Flegle Simon Deary LLP
contact info
Douglas E Brayley
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Samuel Goodwin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Proctor
Represented By
Matthew W Ray
Loewinsohn Flegle Simon Deary LLP
contact info
Douglas E Brayley
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Samuel Goodwin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tetria Global Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Matthew W Ray
Loewinsohn Flegle Simon Deary LLP
contact info
Douglas E Brayley
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Samuel Goodwin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Defendant
Novapath Supply Chain Systems Inc
Represented By
Matthew W Ray
Loewinsohn Flegle Simon Deary LLP
contact info
Douglas E Brayley
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Samuel Goodwin
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AFS Logistics LLC
Represented By
Michael D Lowe
Kean Miller LLP
contact info
April Lee Walter
Kean Miller LLP
contact info
Brian Ross Carnie
Kean Miller LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 20 2022
Opinion and Order: The Court DENIES all four motions to seal. ECF Nos. 73-76. Accordingly, since Defendants' Rule 6(b)(1)(B) Motion Regarding Timing of Summary Judgment Supporting Materials seeks leave to file ECF Nos. 73-76 late, the Court finds that it is MOOT. Now pending before the Court are the motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. 62-72), filed by all of the Defendants. As there are no briefs and evidence in support of those motions, they are hereby DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/20/2022). (fba)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, December 09, 2022
90 90 order Judgment Fri 12/09 11:38 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the above-captioned case is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/9/2022) (fba)
Related: [-]
89 89 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 12/09 11:32 AM
ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Motion for Order of Dismissal (ECF No.88 ) and DISMISSES the above captioned case with prejudice. Final judgment shall issue. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/9/2022) (fba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
88 88 motion Dismiss Wed 12/07 2:41 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by AFS Logistics LLC (Carnie, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order