Washington Western District Court
Judge:David G Estudillo
Case #: 3:21-cv-05710
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2021
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 23, 2022 1:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Karstan Walker
E-Filing/Service 12801 NE 13TH AVE
VANCOUVER, WA 98685
Defendant
Kristopher Walker
Defendant
Ronald Yauchzee
Plaintiff
TCAIXP LLC
Represented By
Bradley W Andersen
Landerholm, P.S.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wykanush Ventures LLC
Represented By
Bradley W Andersen
Landerholm, P.S.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
94 94 order Judgment - Default Fri 02/28 11:38 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' DAMAGES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this Judgment and Money Award is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff Wykanush Ventures, LLC and against Karstan Walker aka Karstan Yauchzee, in the principal amount of $259,838.61, plus prejudgment interest from September 24, 2020 through February 28, 2025, in the amount of $138,219.90, plus post judgment interest at the statutory rate of 12% per annum ($85.43 per diem), from March 1, 2025, until paid, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1961(a). IT IS FURTHER ADJUDGED that this Judgment and Money Award shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff TCAIXP LLC dba Eden and against Karstan Walker aka Karstan Yauchzee in the principal amount of $32,935.00, plus prejudgment interest from September 24, 2020 through February 28, 2025, in the amount of $17,519.62, plus post judgment interest at the statutory rate of 12% per annum ($10.83 per diem), from March 1, 2025, until paid, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1961(a). Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
93 93 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Wed 02/26 12:23 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re92 Evidentiary Hearing,, Judgment of Default and Money Award Against Karstan Walker aka Karstan Yarchzee (Meyer, Andrea)
Related: [-]