New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:21-cv-05331
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2021
Terminated:Jul 14, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 23, 2022 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc.
Represented By
Wendy J. Mellk
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Catherine Tucciarello
contact info
Defendant
CoAdvantage Resources Inc.
Represented By
Wendy J. Mellk
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Catherine Tucciarello
contact info
Defendant
Brian Finkel
Represented By
Wendy J. Mellk
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Catherine Tucciarello
contact info
Plaintiff
Nitzan Bradin
Represented By
Amit Kumar
Law Offices Of William Cafaro
contact info


Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Thursday, July 14, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 07/14 9:27 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: In light of the settlement in principle this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to its reinstatement should the settlement not be consummated. Barring any further requests for an extension within 90 days of this order, this dismissal shall deemed with prejudiceOrdered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/14/2022. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Wed 07/13 10:11 PM
REPORT of Mediation settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 7/27/2022. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
27 27 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/13 11:21 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadlines amended. See attached order. Next Tele-Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/4/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/13/2022. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Status Conference Mon 06/13 11:19 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference held on 6/13/2022. An amended scheduling order has been entered. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/13/2022. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
25 25 7 pgs order Stipulation and Order Thu 06/02 9:33 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: The parties' stipulated protective order, DE24 is so ordered. See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/2/2022. (Pincsak, Lydia)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/02 9:22 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Catherine Tucciarello is terminated as counsel for Defendants, and the Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to remove her from future ECF notifications. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/2/2022. (Pincsak, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
24 24 misc Stipulation Wed 06/01 2:32 PM
STIPULATION concerning confidentiality by Nitzan Bradin (Kumar, Amit)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Declaration Wed 06/01 12:41 PM
DECLARATION re22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., CoAdvantage Resources Inc., Brian Finkel (Tucciarello, Catherine)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 06/01 12:40 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., CoAdvantage Resources Inc., Brian Finkel. (Tucciarello, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
adr Selection of Mediator Fri 04/01 4:35 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Giulio Zanolla selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on April 19, 2022 at 10:00am. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms.The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
21 21 adr Mediation Status Report Mon 03/28 6:12 PM
MEDIATION STATUS REPORT Selection of Mediator by CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., CoAdvantage Resources Inc., Brian Finkel (Mellk, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
20 20 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/14 2:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines set; see attached Order. Next Tele-Status Conference set for 6/13/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/14/2022. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Mon 03/14 2:12 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Initial Conference Hearing held on 3/14/2022. The Court has adopted and So Ordered the parties proposed scheduling order, DE [18-1], submitted by the parties. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 03/14 2:30 PM
Electronic ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. The case is respectfully referred to the EDNY mediation program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.8. Selection of mediator due by 3/28/2022. Mediation shall be completed by 5/13/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/14/2022. (Pincsak, Lydia)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Mon 03/14 2:47 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
18 18 misc Letter Thu 03/10 1:11 PM
Letter Enclosing Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., CoAdvantage Resources Inc., Brian Finkel (Mellk, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
17 17 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/26 10:12 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: A Tele-Initial Conference is set for 3/14/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 1/26/2022. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules,
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet
Friday, January 14, 2022
16 16 17 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 01/14 1:12 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by CoAdvantage Resources Inc.. (Mellk, Wendy)
Related: [-]
15 15 16 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 01/14 1:11 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., Brian Finkel. (Mellk, Wendy)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/14 1:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CoAdvantage Corporation, Corporate Parent AQ Carver Parent, LP for CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc.. (Mellk, Wendy)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/14 1:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CoAdvantage Resources Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CoAdvantage Corporation, Corporate Parent AQ Carver Parent, LP for CoAdvantage Resources Inc.. (Mellk, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/02 10:59 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., CoAdvantage Resources Inc., Brian Finkel, filed by Nitzan Bradin. (Kumar, Amit)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
11 11 order Order(Other) Thu 11/18 12:14 PM
Order re: DE8 Stipulation Allowing Plaintiff to Amend Complaint; Waiving Defendants' Defenses; Extending time for Defendants to file Answer; and Request to So Order. The parties' joint stipulation is So Ordered; see attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/18/2021. (Pincsak, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/15 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Tucciarello on behalf of CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., CoAdvantage Resources Inc., Brian Finkel (aty to be noticed) (Tucciarello, Catherine)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/15 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy J. Mellk on behalf of CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., CoAdvantage Resources Inc., Brian Finkel (aty to be noticed) (Mellk, Wendy)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Mon 11/15 10:21 AM
STIPULATION Allowing Plaintiff to Amend Complaint; Waiving Defendants' Defenses; Extending time for Defendants to file Answer; and Request to So Order by Nitzan Bradin (Kumar, Amit)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/12 2:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nitzan Bradin. CoAdvantage Resources Inc. served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Kumar, Amit)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/02 1:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nitzan Bradin. Brian Finkel served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Kumar, Amit)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/07 9:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nitzan Bradin. CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc. served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Kumar, Amit)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 09/27 8:52 AM
Summons Issued as to CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., CoAdvantage Resources Inc., Brian Finkel. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 09/27 8:48 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 09/27 8:43 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/27 8:48 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/24 8:55 PM
COMPLAINT against CoAdvantage Resources 23 Inc., CoAdvantage Resources Inc., Brian Finkel filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14872368 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Nitzan Bradin. (Kumar, Amit)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons