Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:21-cv-01273
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Libel, Assault, Slander
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2021
Terminated:Apr 06, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 22, 2022 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN/JANE DOES 2-10
Defendant
CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO
Represented By
Tamar S. Wise
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Michael B. DE Leeuw
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Rachel Wenger
contact info
Defendant
SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By
Tamar S. Wise
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Michael B. DE Leeuw
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Rachel Wenger
contact info
Plaintiff
STEFAN GALLUPPI
Represented By
Jessica Lucas
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
S. Manoj Jegasothy
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LIFEMD, INC
Represented By
Jessica Lucas
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
S. Manoj Jegasothy
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JUSTIN SCHREIBER
Represented By
Jessica Lucas
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
S. Manoj Jegasothy
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 13 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 6 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/13/22. (eca)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 06, 2023
37 37 order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/06 1:45 PM
ORDER OF COURT. Upon review of36 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by LIFEMD, INC, this action is dismissed against all defendants with prejudice, with each party bearing their own respective costs, expenses, and attorney fees. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/06/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Thu 04/06 9:01 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by LIFEMD, INC. (Golen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
35 35 6 pgs order Protective Order Tue 02/28 3:04 PM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 02/28/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Proposed Order Tue 02/28 2:24 PM
Proposed Order Stipulated Confidentiality Order by STEFAN GALLUPPI, LIFEMD, INC, JUSTIN SCHREIBER. (Golen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
33 33 adr Report of Mediation Mon 11/07 4:49 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Case has not been resolved. THOMAS T. FRAMPTON terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed [LINK:here] or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 11/7/2022. (Frampton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
32 32 adr Notice of Mediation Tue 10/04 4:28 PM
Notice of Mediation by THOMAS T. FRAMPTON. Mediation Date November 7, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (Frampton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 10/04 2:36 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Judge Thomas Frampton is appointed as mediator. Mediation to be concluded by 12/05/22. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/04/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
30 30 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Tue 10/04 1:56 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by STEFAN GALLUPPI, LIFEMD, INC, JUSTIN SCHREIBER. (Golen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
29 29 order Case Management Order Wed 09/14 10:32 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 03/14/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 03/14/2023; Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 04/14/2023; Defendant Expert Reports due by 05/15/2023; Discovery due by 06/15/2023; Summary Judgment due by 06/30/2023; Response to Summary Judgment due by 07/31/2023; Reply brief due by 08/14/2023. Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 06/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/14/2022. (rgm)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Initial Case Management Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 09/14 10:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 09/14/2022. Case management deadlines set. Amended ADR Stipulation due by 09/28/2022. (Court Reporter: None) (rgm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
27 27 order Protective Order Thu 09/08 8:28 AM
ORDER IMPLEMENTING FED. R. EVID. 502(d). Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/08/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
26 26 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 09/07 2:53 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Golen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
25 25 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Wed 09/07 2:51 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by STEFAN GALLUPPI, LIFEMD, INC, JUSTIN SCHREIBER. (Golen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Thu 08/25 12:54 PM
MOTION for attorney Damon W.D. Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7260351) by STEFAN GALLUPPI, LIFEMD, INC, JUSTIN SCHREIBER. (D Wright, Damon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Thu 08/25 12:47 PM
MOTION for attorney Joseph L. Meadows to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7260325) by STEFAN GALLUPPI, LIFEMD, INC, JUSTIN SCHREIBER. (Meadows, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/25 2:58 PM
ORDER GRANTING22 and23 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Joseph L. Meadows and Damon W. D. Wright are admitted pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/25/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/08 3:25 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 8/30/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 9/7/2022. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/08/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/08 3:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (DE Leeuw, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Mon 07/25 1:54 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING15 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 07/25/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
18 18 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/12 12:45 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re15 Motion for Reconsideration filed by STEFAN GALLUPPI, LIFEMD, INC, JUSTIN SCHREIBER. (Golen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Thu 06/23 11:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Response and brief in opposition, not to exceed ten pages, to15 Motion for Reconsideration due by 7/14/2022. No reply brief permitted absent leave of court. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/23/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
16 16 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 06/22 4:45 PM
BRIEF in Support re15 Motion for Reconsideration filed by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (DE Leeuw, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Reconsideration Wed 06/22 4:44 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re14 Order on Motion to Dismiss by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (DE Leeuw, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 13, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 06/13 12:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/13/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
13 13 28 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 06/13 12:35 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re6 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/13/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/09 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Golen, II on behalf of STEFAN GALLUPPI, LIFEMD, INC, JUSTIN SCHREIBER. (Golen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Wed 11/17 3:01 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LIFEMD, INC. (Lucas, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/10 4:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (DE Leeuw, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
9 9 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/03 3:12 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re6 Motion to Dismiss filed by STEFAN GALLUPPI. (Lucas, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule Wed 10/13 7:55 AM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re6 Motion to Dismiss: Response and Brief Brief in Opposition, not to exceed twenty pages, due by 11/03/2021; Reply brief, not to exceed fifteen pages, due by 11/10/2021. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/13/2021. (rgm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
7 7 26 pgs respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 10/12 7:35 PM
BRIEF in Support re6 Motion to Dismiss - Memorandum of Law In Support Of Defendants Christian Matthew Lamarco and Shadyside Partners, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (DE Leeuw, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss Tue 10/12 7:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint re1 Notice of Removal, by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (DE Leeuw, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 01, 2021
5 5 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/01 8:14 AM
ORDER GRANTING3 and4 Motions for Michael de Leeuw and Tamar Wise to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michael de Leeuw and Tamar Wise are admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Christian Matthew Lamarco and Shadyside Partners, LLC. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/01/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Thu 09/30 3:22 PM
MOTION for attorney Tamar Wise to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6734243) by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (Wise, Tamar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Thu 09/30 3:10 PM
MOTION for attorney Michael de Leeuw to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6734130) by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (DE Leeuw, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, September 24, 2021
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Fri 09/24 2:56 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (Wenger, Rachel)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Fri 09/24 12:34 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement as to SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC only within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/1/2021. (jv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
1 1 6 pgs cmp Notice of Removal (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Fri 09/24 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-21-011364 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6724124), filed by CHRISTIAN MATTHEW LAMARCO, SHADYSIDE PARTNERS, LLC. (jv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 70 pgs Exhibit A