Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:21-cv-03098
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 22, 2022 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Honeywell International Inc
Defendant
BASF Corp
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
3M Company, The
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Plaintiff
Curtis White
Represented By
Robin M Primeau
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary White
Represented By
Robin M Primeau
Murray Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/08 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Primeau, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, November 15, 2021
4 4 misc Status Report Mon 11/15 5:37 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 09/24 1:10 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), White et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3098-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern Illinois (sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/24 1:09 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/24 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10089828.), filed by Curtis White, Mary White. Service due by 12/22/2021(sshe, )
Related: [-]