Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:21-mj-01175
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2021
Last checked: Friday Sep 24, 2021 9:27 PM HST
Defendant
Steven Sloan, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Melinda K. Yamaga
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Sharron I. Rancourt
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Darren W.K. Ching
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/24/2021 10:03 PM HST
Thursday, September 23, 2021
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT; AFFIDAVIT in Support of Criminal Complaint as to Steven Sloan, Jr (1) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 9/23/2021. (emt, )
Related: [-]
3 3 EO : as to defendant (1) Steven Sloan, Jr - Initial Appearance is set for 9/24/2021 at 09:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties have been notified. (Sharron I. Rancourt and the Office of the Federal Public Defender are provisionally appointed pending submission of Defendant's Financial Affidavit form at a later date). Pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's current Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings Pursuant to the CARES Act , this hearing will be held telephonically via AT&T Connect Audio Conference. Call-in information for this hearing is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number is 1-888-363-4735. Access Code is 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
Related: [-]