Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:21-mj-00785
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2021
Terminated:Jul 22, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Sep 25, 2021 9:15 PM HST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Craig S. Nolan
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Gabriel Antone Eberhardt (1)
Terminated: 07/22/2021


Docket last updated: 01/19/2022 7:07 AM HST
Monday, June 28, 2021
1 1 9 pgs SEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT, AFFIDAVIT in Support of Criminal Complaint as to Gabriel Antone Eberhardt (1) - Signed by JUDGE ROM TRADER on 6/28/2021. (emt, ) Modified on 8/13/2021 (emt, ).
Related: [-]
3 3 EX PARTE MOTION TO SEAL COMPLAINT, AFFIDAVIT, DECLARATION AND WARRANTS FOR ARREST; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL; ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO SEAL as to Gabriel Antone Eberhardt - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 6/28/2021. (SEALED) (emt, )
Related: [-]