Original Case: 1:20-cv-03379

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-prici-13291
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2021
Terminated:Mar 25, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 30, 2022 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC
Represented By
Allison Giardina Rhadans
McGuireWoods, LLP
contact info
Jarrod Sean Mendel
McGuireWoods, LLP
contact info
Stephanie Jo Peel
McGuireWoods LLP
contact info
Christine S. Kapur
McGuireWoods, LLP
contact info
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
McGuireWoods, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JEAN PARAISON
Represented By
Catherine Gibson McCauley
The Gibson Law Firm, LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 25 2022
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Jean Paraison. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.

Docket last updated: 03/30/2022 4:29 AM EDT
Friday, September 24, 2021
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jean Paraison on 09/23/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/03/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/08/2021 as to Appellant Jean Paraison. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/22/2021 as to Appellee Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties
Att: 2 4 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 14 pgs USDC Order- doc #22