Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Charmiane G Claxton
Case #: 2:21-cv-02608
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause05:0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2021
Terminated:Jan 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 27, 2022 4:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Southern Towing Company
Represented By
Gregory W. O'Neal
Bratton O'Neal & Thorp, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Perry Blystone
Represented By
Lee J. Bloomfield
Godwin Morris Laurenzi & Bloomfield, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, January 30, 2023
19 19 order Judgment Mon 01/30 10:54 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 01/30/2023. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/27 12:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Southern Towing Company. (O'Neal, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/22 4:28 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/22/2022. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Setting Letter Thu 09/22 2:23 PM
NOTICE RE-SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: The Jury Trial is reset for Monday, October 30, 2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 5 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by close of business on Friday, October 6, 2023. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, October 13, 2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (smm)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 09/22 2:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: A Status Conference, to discuss the Joint Motion to Extend Deadline/Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Continue Trial Date11 was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 9/22/2022. Lee J. Bloomfield appeared for the plaintiff(s). Gregory W. ONeal appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the status of the case, dates and deadlines with the parties. The Joint Motion to Extend Deadline/Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Continue Trial Date11 was granted. The Jury Trial is reset for Monday, October 30, 2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 5 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by close of business on Friday, October 6, 2023. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, October 13, 2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Amended Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter: Catherine Phillips) (smm)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 09/22 2:52 PM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Parties move together for a trial continuance and an extension of trial-related deadlines. (ECF No. 11.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Court will enter an amended scheduling order by separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/22/2022. (kej)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
notice Setting Letter - Teams Mon 09/19 5:17 PM
SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling/Status Conference, to discuss the Joint Motion to Extend Deadline/Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Continue Trial Date11 has been set for Thursday, September 22, 2022 at 2:00 P.M. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions. (smm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
12 12 3 pgs misc Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 09/16 3:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Continue Trial Date (proposed order submitted) filed by Southern Towing Company. (O'Neal, Gregory)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extend Deadline Fri 09/16 3:56 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Continue Trial Date (proposed order submitted) by Southern Towing Company. (O'Neal, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/30 11:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/30/2021. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 11/30 9:18 AM
Minute Entry for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/30/2021. Jeff Lee Bloomfield appeared for the Plaintiff. Gregory ONeal appeared for the Defendant. The Court set scheduling dates: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/2/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial set for 6/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court reporter: Cathy Phillips) (jam) Modified on 11/30/2021 (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 11/23 10:57 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Discovery Plan . (O'Neal, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
7 7 notice Setting Letter Mon 11/01 3:56 PM
SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Please call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215. (mlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/25 6:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Southern Towing Company.(O'Neal, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Tue 09/28 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Tue 09/28 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ADR Compliance Tue 09/28 3:22 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 09/28 3:20 PM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/28 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Southern Towing Company, filed by Perry Blystone.(Bloomfield, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet