Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Case #: 1:21-cv-00623
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2021
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 27, 2022 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Carrie Corder
Represented By
Bartholomew T Freeze
Freund Freeze & Arnold
contact info
Kelly Marie Schroeder
Freund Freeze & Arnold
contact info
Defendant
John Austin Hopkins
Defendant
Daniel Schroer
Represented By
Bartholomew T Freeze
Freund Freeze & Arnold
contact info
Kelly Marie Schroeder
Freund Freeze & Arnold
contact info
Defendant
Springboro Community City School District Board of Education
1685 South Main Street
Springboro, OH 45066
Represented By
Bartholomew T Freeze
Freund Freeze & Arnold
contact info
Kelly Marie Schroeder
Freund Freeze & Arnold
contact info
C Bronston McCord, III
contact info
Plaintiff
John/Jane Doe
Represented By
Seth James Kraus
Gibbs & Associates Law Firm
contact info
Jonathan Gibbs
Gibbs & Associates Law Firm, LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 25 2022
ORDER denying 6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/25/2022. (rrs)
GPO Jan 31 2024
OPINION AND ORDER denying 37 Hopkins's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 1/31/24. (sct)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 13, 2024
48 48 appeal USCA Order Fri 09/13 9:33 AM
ORDER of USCA It is ORDERED that the case is dismissed pursuant to 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure as to44 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Austin Hopkins Note: No Mandate to issue . (pb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/13 4:22 PM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to47 Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice. (sct)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
47 47 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/12 12:15 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff John/Jane Doe (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/07 3:02 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting45 Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement Discussions. SO ORDERED.Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/7/24. (sct)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
46 46 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 03/06 11:00 AM
USCA Case Number 24-3183 for44 Notice of Appeal; Gretchen S. Abruzzo, Case Manager (513-564-7018). (kh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
45 45 motion Stay Mon 03/04 1:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement Discussions by Defendant John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
44 44 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 02/29 5:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re42 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,33 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, (Filing fee has been paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9843623) by Defendant John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
43 43 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 02/14 9:44 AM
ANSWER to34 Amended Complaint filed by John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
42 42 18 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 01/31 10:29 AM
OPINION AND ORDER denying37 Hopkins's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 1/31/24. (sct)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/03 1:19 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Defendant John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Corrective Docket Entry Wed 01/03 2:29 PM
Notice of Correction re: 40 Reply (non motion) refiled as41 Reply to Response to Motion. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/13 4:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Plaintiff John/Jane Doe. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/15 4:30 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting38 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines for Response Pleading to37 Defendant John Austin Hopkins' Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 12/13/23. Reply due by 1/3/24. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 11/15/23. (sct)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/14 9:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 12/13/2023. by Plaintiff John/Jane Doe. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 09, 2023
37 37 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/09 3:22 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Oral Argument Requested) by Defendant John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/26 10:52 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting36 Defendant Hopkins' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines for Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. John Austin Hopkins to move, answer, or otherwise plead by 10/9/23. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 9/26/23. (sct)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
36 36 motion Extension of Time Mon 09/25 3:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/9/2023. to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 21, 2023
35 35 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 09/21 3:41 PM
Defendants ANSWER to34 Amended Complaint filed by Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
34 34 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/07 2:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John/Jane Doe. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Thu 08/03 12:14 PM
ORDER granting29 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint in full. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed amended complaint on the docket of the Court. Defendant Hopkins'22 Motion to Dismiss and the other Defendants'23 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings, which were directed at the previous Complaint, are denied as moot. If any Defendant wishes to refile their motion after considering the Amended Complaint, they may do so within the time frame set out by the Federal Rules. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/3/23. (sct)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/17 11:50 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, filed by Defendant John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 05/09 6:28 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting31 Defendant John Austin Hopkins' Unopposed Motion to Stay Reply Brief. Hopkins' reply in support of his motion to dismiss shall be stayed until after the Court rules on29 plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 5/9/23. (sct)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
31 31 motion Stay Mon 05/08 3:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Reply Brief for Defendant John Austin Hopkins by Defendant John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 05, 2023
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/05 3:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial Reply in Support of Motion of the School Defendants for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Springboro Community City School District Board of Education. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
29 29 motion Amend/Correct Wed 04/26 12:40 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by Plaintiff John/Jane Doe. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/25 4:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff John/Jane Doe. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/25 4:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial filed by Plaintiff John/Jane Doe. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
26 26 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 04/13 3:56 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 4/13/23. (sct)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/13 2:30 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting25 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to22 Defendant Hopkins' MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and23 Springboro Defendants' MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Responses due by 4/25/23. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 4/13/23. (sct)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/10 10:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 4/25/2023. by Plaintiff John/Jane Doe. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
24 24 motion Protective Order Mon 04/10 4:50 PM
MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed) by Defendants Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
23 23 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 03/21 4:34 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial by Defendants Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/21 4:29 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
21 21 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Fri 01/20 5:34 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 1/23/23. Motions to amend the pleadings and/or additional parties due by 2/28/23. Motions directed to pleadings due by 3/21/23. Lay Witnesses due by 5/5/23. Plaintiff Primary Experts due by 6/15/23. Defendant Primary Experts due by 7/17/23. Rebuttal Experts due by 8/15/23. Discovery due by 9/15/23. Dispositive motions due by 10/31/23. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 1/20/23. (sct)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 01/20 12:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/20/23. Jonathan Gibbs and Seth Kraus appeared for Plaintiffs; Bart Freeze appeared for Defendants Springboro Community City School District Board of Education, Daniel Schroer, and Carrie Corder; William Braff appeared for Defendant John Austin Hopkins. The parties discussed using the discovery and depositions from case 1:19-cv-785 for this case. Mr. Freeze expressed concerns regarding providing those items in light of the protective order in the other case. The Court advised the parties that it will enter an order allowing Mr. Freeze to provide discovery and depositions after confirming with Plaintiffs' counsel in the related case. Mr. Kraus advised that they plan on having a protective order entered in this case, which will include attorneys' eyes-only designations for the videos to be provided in discovery. Mr. Braff raised concerns about his client's ability to challenge that designation in the future if necessary. The Court advised the parties to include a provision in the protective order that will preserve any party's right to challenge designations. A calendar order utilizing the proposed dates in the related case to be issued. (sct)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/24 12:41 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting20 Defendant John Austin Hopkins' Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines for his Initial Disclosures. Initial Disclosures due by 1/23/23. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 10/24/22. (sct)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 10/24 5:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/24/22. Jonathan Gibbs and Seth Kraus appeared for Plaintiff; Bart Freeze appeared for Defendants Springboro Community City School District Board of Education, Daniel Schroer, Carrie Corder; William Braff appeared for Defendant John Austin Hopkins. The parties advised the Court that the case is in the preliminary discovery stage. The Court requested that the parties work together on a new proposed calendar, in light of Mr. Braff's recent appointment as counsel for Defendant Hopkins. (sct)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
20 20 motion Extension of Time Fri 10/21 4:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/23/2023. to Extend Deadlines for Defendant John Austin Hopkins' Initial Disclosures by Defendant John Austin Hopkins. (Braff, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 10/17 7:14 PM
ORDER appointing William E. Braff to represent John Austin Hopkins in all proceedings in this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 10/17/22. (sct)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
18 18 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Fri 09/23 10:43 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 10/24/22. Motions to amend the pleadings and/or add additional parties due by 11/30/22. Motions directed to pleadings due by 12/30/22. Lay Witnesses due by 2/15/23. Plaintiff Primary Experts due by 3/15/23. Defendant Primary Experts due by 4/14/23. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/28/23 at 10:00 AM. Rebuttal Experts due by 5/15/23. Discovery due by 5/15/23. Dispositive motions due by 7/28/23. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 9/23/22. (sct)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 09/23 4:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone held on 9/23/22. Jonathan Gibbs and Seth Kraus appeared for Plaintiff; Bartholomew Freeze appeared for Defendants Springboro Community City School District Board of Education, Daniel Schroer, and Carrie Corder. The related case (1:19-cv-785) was discussed. The Court suggested to the parties to use the discovery from the related case whenever possible. Calendar Order to issue. (sct)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 09/19 1:19 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Continue Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/19 12:59 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting16 Defendants' Motion to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone reset for 9/23/22 at 1:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 9/19/22. (sct)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
16 16 motion Continue Miscellaneous Relief Wed 09/14 1:19 PM
MOTION to Continue or, Alternatively, Allow Counsel of Record to Appear in Lieu of Trial Counsel by Defendants Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education. (Freeze, Bartholomew). Added second MOTION on 9/14/2022 (kl)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/14 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Myrl H. Shoemaker, III for Defendants Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education (Shoemaker, Myrl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
14 14 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 06/07 1:42 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Timothy S. Black no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/1/22. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/14 12:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
12 12 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Tue 01/25 1:25 PM
ORDER denying6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/25/2022. (rrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/17 3:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Springboro Community City School District Board of Education on 12/14/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/17 3:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Daniel Schroer on 12/14/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/17 3:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Carrie Corder on 12/14/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate of Service Fri 12/17 3:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff John/Jane Doe as to Defendant John Austin Hopkins (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
7 7 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 12/15 12:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Amended filed by Defendants Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
6 6 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 11/16 4:44 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/10 8:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bartholomew T Freeze for Defendants Carrie Corder, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District Board of Education (Freeze, Bartholomew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
4 4 order Related Case Memorandum Thu 09/30 11:13 AM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/30/2021. The Judge agrees that Case Nos. 1:21-cv-623 and 1:19-cv-785 are RELATED and shall both remain on his docket. (kl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 09/29 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Carrie Corder, John Austin Hopkins, Daniel Schroer, Springboro Community City School District. (kl)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 09/29 8:59 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/28 5:18 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8518555), filed by John/Jane Doe. (Kraus, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form Civil Summons