Elliott v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03151 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 27, 2022 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
2 Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Heidi Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(London, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 09/28 4:19 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Elliott v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3151-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Maryland (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10097500.), filed by Heidi Elliott. Service due by 12/29/2021(sshe, ) |