Project Veritas v. Leland Stanford Junior University et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas S Zilly |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01326 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 28, 2022 3:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Leland Stanford Junior University
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
University of Washington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Project Veritas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
misc
Registry Disbursement
Tue 10/24 9:42 AM
REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT made on 10/24/2023 to THE BOARD OF TRUSTEE OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY in the amount of $172,270.24 re77 Order on Stipulated Motion, (No PDF image attached) (SMG) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
77 | 77
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion
Mon 10/23 12:15 PM
ORDER: Mandate having issued on October 18, 2023, docket no.76 , the parties' stipulated motion, docket no.75 , is GRANTED, and the stay of execution on judgment pending disposition on appeal is hereby LIFTED. The Clerk is AUTHORIZED and DIRECTED to draw a check on the funds deposited in the Registry of this Court in the principal amount of $164,556.59, plus all accrued interest, minus the fee described in Local Civil Rule 67(c), payable to The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, and to mail or deliver the check to The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University (Stanford). Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 67(b), counsel for Stanford shall email Stanford's mailing address and completed IRS W-9 form to the Clerk's Office Finance Department. Such disbursement to Stanford shall constitute full and final satisfaction of the Court's Judgment, docket no.71 . This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MJV)(cc: Finance) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
76 | 76
appeal
Mandate of USCA
Fri 10/20 4:56 PM
MANDATE/ORDER OF USCA 22-35477 as to58 Notice of Appeal, filed by Project Veritas. The parties stipulated motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal (Dkt. No. 50) is GRANTED . See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order constitutes the mandate of this court. DISMISSED . (RE) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
75 | 75
motion
Stipulated Motion
Tue 10/17 3:02 PM
Stipulated MOTION TO LIFT STAY ON EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT AND RELINQUISH SUPERSEDEAS BOND , filed by Defendant Leland Stanford Junior University. Noting Date 10/17/2023, (Brand, Lee) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |