California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 2:21-cv-07788
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2021
Terminated:Jan 21, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 29, 2022 2:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Mor Furniture For Less, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel E Gardenswartz
Solomon Ward Seidenwurm & Smith LLP
contact info
Mei-Ying M Imanaka
Solomon Ward Seidenwurm And Smith LLP
contact info
Harsh Y. Ronvelia
Solomon Ward Seidenwurn And Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Hon Victor E Bianchini
Represented By
Victor Eugene Bianchini
Judicate West Mediation Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Portia Mason
Represented By
Binyamin I Manoucheri
Wilshire Law Firm
contact info
Thiago Merlini Coelho
Wilshire Law Firm
contact info
Jasmine Behroozan
Wilshire Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 18, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/22 10:08 AM
ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF ACTION23 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Portia Mason and Defendant Mor Furniture for Less, Inc.'s joint request that this Court enter a dismissal with prejudice as to Plaintiff's individual claims in their entirety and without prejudice as to the claims of absent putative class members in the above-entitled action, is GRANTED in full. Each party shall bear her or its own fees and costs. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
23 23 stip Dismiss Case Tue 02/15 5:12 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason.(Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 21, 2022
22 22 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/21 5:10 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of the parties' joint status report, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety21 , this action is placed in inactive status. By 3/21/2022, the parties shall file either (1) a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal of the action or judgment, or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of 3/22/2022. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. The stay in this action is LIFTED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
21 21 misc Status Report Thu 01/20 5:02 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Mor Furniture For Less, Inc.. (Ronvelia, Harsh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/03 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Evidence Showing Absence of ADA Violation(s) filed by defendant Mor Furniture For Less, Inc.. (Ronvelia, Harsh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
19 19 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Wed 12/01 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Victor E Bianchini has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
18 18 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Tue 11/30 5:43 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Hon. Victor Bianchini Related [+] may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason(Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-] t.
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
17 17 misc Statement Tue 11/23 5:59 PM
STATEMENT Plaintiff's Case Statement filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22)16 . (Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
16 16 order Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) Tue 11/09 11:16 AM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting13 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Defendant. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 1/31/2022. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 10/29 12:06 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Harsh Y. Ronvelia counsel for Defendant Mor Furniture For Less, Inc.. Adding Harsh Y. Ronvelia as counsel of record for Mor Furniture For Less, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Mor Furniture For Less, Inc.. (Attorney Harsh Y. Ronvelia added to party Mor Furniture For Less, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ronvelia, Harsh)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 10/29 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mor Furniture For Less, Inc., identifying Mor Furniture for Less, Inc., Portia Mason, Globed, Inc., a California corporation, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Healthcare Group Co., Ltd., a Hong Kong corporation, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attorney Mei-Ying M Imanaka added to party Mor Furniture For Less, Inc.(pty:dft))(Imanaka, Mei-Ying)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
13 13 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Thu 10/28 4:17 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Mor Furniture For Less, Inc.. (Gardenswartz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10/28 4:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Mor Furniture For Less, Inc..(Attorney Daniel E Gardenswartz added to party Mor Furniture For Less, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gardenswartz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 10/08 1:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Portia Mason, upon Defendant Mor Furniture For Less, Inc. served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christopher Roy Arnold, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
10 10 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Mon 10/04 11:55 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 10/04 11:54 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/30 1:38 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Mor Furniture For Less, Inc. (esa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 09/30 1:37 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 09/30 1:36 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 09/30 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 09/30 12:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 09/30 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Portia Mason, (Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 09/30 12:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/30 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32076703 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho added to party Portia Mason(pty:pla))(Coelho, Thiago)
Related: [-]