Harris et al v. CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joshua D Wolson |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-04306 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Bucks County Court of Common Pleas, 21-02825 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 29, 2022 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT
20 WELDEN DRIVE
DOYLESTOWN, PA 18901 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Harris
ET AL. 3117 HOLICONG ROAD
DOYLESTOWN, PA 18902 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF BUCKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/26/21. 10/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL AND CCP OF BUCKS COUNTY.(mbh, ) |
|
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() STIPULATION to Remand by CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT. (SWEENEY, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER STRIKING3 DEFENDANT'S 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT SET FORTH IN SECTION II.B.4 OF JUDGE WOLSON'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. DEFENDANT IS GRANTED LEAVE TO COMPLY WITH THIS REQUIREMENT AND RE-FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS, IF NECESSARY, ON OR BEFORE 10/22/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, ON OR BEFORE 10/22/2021, EACH PARTY SHALL FILE A MEMORANDUM, NOT TO EXCEED 10 PAGES, ADDRESSING WHETHER THE COURT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER THIS DISPUTE OR WHETHER THE COURT SHOULD REMAND THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/12/2021.10/12/2021 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja, ) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL I. LEVIN on behalf of CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(LEVIN, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SWEENEY, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() AMENDED DOCUMENT by CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), Designation Form . (SWEENEY, MICHAEL) |
|
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Fri 10/01 8:42 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt, ) |
||
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15445964), filed by CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT.(SWEENEY, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |