Mallory et al v. Allied Servicing Corporation et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | John J Mcconnell, Jr |
Referred: | Lincoln D Almond |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00397 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 29, 2022 6:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Allied Servicing Corporation
3019 N. Argonne Road
Spokane Valley, WA 99212 |
|
Defendant
Porch Swing Holdings, LLC
15030 Ventura Blvd # 307
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403 |
|
Plaintiff
Linda Mallory
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Mallory
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago |
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
order
Order
Wed 08/10 3:39 PM
TEXT ORDER: This case is dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to comply with the order entered on July 6, 2022, directing the plaintiff to show cause by August 8, 2022, why the matter should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/10/2022. (Simoncelli, Michael) |
||
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
order
Order to Show Cause (Form Attached)
Wed 07/06 1:29 PM
TEXT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution on or before 8/8/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/6/2022. (Simoncelli, Michael) |
||
Monday, October 04, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER granting3 Motion for TRO. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/4/2021. (Jackson, Ryan) |
|
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 10/04 10:03 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.:In Chambers Conference/Hearing via Zoom held on 10/4/2021 re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Linda Mallory, Wayne Mallory: counsel present: J. Ennis; Counsel directed to submit a proposed Order on his motion for the Court's review. Adjourned. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .(Ennis, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Fri 10/01 12:25 PM
NOTICE of IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE via ZOOM re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: In Chambers Conference/Hearing via Zoom scheduled for MOnday 10/4/2021 at 9:00 AM as a Remote Hearing before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Zoom information has been emailed to counsel of record and said counsel has been directed to serve this notice, and the related Zoom invitation and information, upon counsel for the defendants. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla) |
|
3 | 3
![]() MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs.(Ennis, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case:1 Complaint, . (Ennis, John) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1672002 ), filed by Wayne Mallory, Linda Mallory.(Ennis, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/30 4:41 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla) |