Missouri Western District Court
Judge:M Douglas Harpool
Case #: 6:21-cv-03256
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2021
Terminated:Feb 28, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 29, 2022 3:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc.
Represented By
Ginger K. Gooch
Husch Blackwell Llp - Spfd
contact info
Danielle Jean Reid
Husch Blackwell Llp - Stl
contact info
Plaintiff
Ellen Neville-Verdugo
Represented By
Steven E. Marsh
Hulston, Jones & Marsh, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 28, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 02/28 3:50 PM
Order of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed on 2/28/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/28 12:45 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal by Ellen Neville-Verdugo. (Marsh, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Fri 01/14 11:48 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ellen Neville-Verdugo Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents filed by Steven E. Marsh on behalf of Plaintiff Ellen Neville-Verdugo.(Marsh, Steven)
Related: [-]
20 20 discov Certificate of Service Fri 01/14 11:47 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ellen Neville-Verdugo Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant filed by Steven E. Marsh on behalf of Plaintiff Ellen Neville-Verdugo.(Marsh, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Fri 01/07 4:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Danielle Jean Reid on behalf of Defendant Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Danielle
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
18 18 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Tue 01/04 11:15 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Steven E. Marsh on behalf of Plaintiff Ellen Neville-Verdugo.(Marsh, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
17 17 adr Designation of Mediator Wed 12/22 11:52 AM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Michael J. Patto Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Danielle
Monday, December 20, 2021
16 16 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Mon 12/20 12:41 PM
ORDER denying6 motion to remand. Signed on 12/20/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Tue 12/14 1:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc. filed by Danielle Jean Reid on behalf of Defendant Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Danielle
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
14 14 adr Designation of Mediator Wed 11/24 10:00 AM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Michael J. Patto Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Danielle
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
13 13 order Rules of trial Tue 11/23 11:25 AM
RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 11/23/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/23 11:24 AM
SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER:( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2023 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for five days beginning 4/17/2023 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2022., Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2023 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/8/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 4/8/2022., Discovery Motions due by 10/5/2022., Status Reports due by 3/30/2022; 6/30/2022 and 9/30/2022.) Discovery due by 10/14/2022. Signed on 11/23/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
11 11 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 11/19 1:43 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Danielle
Friday, November 12, 2021
10 10 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Fri 11/12 4:50 PM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re6 MOTION to remand filed by Steven E. Marsh on behalf of Plaintiff Ellen Neville-Verdugo. Related [+] (Marsh, Steven)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, October 28, 2021
9 9 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/28 9:15 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re6 MOTION to remand filed by Danielle Jean Reid on behalf of Defendant Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 11/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 id, Danielle
Friday, October 22, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/22 1:16 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Ginger K. Gooch on behalf of Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc. (Attorney Ginger K. Gooch added to party Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gooch, Ginger)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
7 7 misc Jury Demand Thu 10/14 3:00 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ellen Neville-Verdugo. (Marsh, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Remand Thu 10/14 2:57 PM
MOTION to remand filed by Steven E. Marsh on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Marsh, Steven)
Related: [-]
order Letter of reassignment Thu 10/14 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Please note the new case number: 21-3256 CV-S-MDH. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
4 4 16 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/07 6:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Community Foundation of the Ozarks, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Danielle
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
notice Notice of Filing Wed 10/06 1:04 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
3 3 order Rule 16 Notice Fri 10/01 4:56 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. The parties' Rule 26 conference shall take place by 11/5/2021, and the parties' proposed scheduling order shall be filed by 11/19/2021. Please see Order for additional deadlines and information. Signed on 10/1/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Fri 10/01 8:41 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Keller, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Fri 10/01 8:43 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff and Defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 10/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/30 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County County, case number 2131-CC00903, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7608175. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Danielle
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet