Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:21-cv-02386
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2021
Terminated:Oct 19, 2021
Case in other court:Maryland, 8:21-cv-01945
Last checked: Monday Mar 28, 2022 3:50 AM CDT
Defendant
US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Sarah L Vuong
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Vickie LeDuc
Us Attorney Office
contact info
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Sarah L Vuong
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Vickie LeDuc
Us Attorney Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Avanthi Katragadda
4915 Morris Avenue, Apt. 3905
Addison, TX 75001
Represented By
Gregory H Siskind
Siskind Susser PC
contact info
Charles H Kuck
Kuck Immigration Partners LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Joseph Immigration Law Firm PC
contact info
Johnna J Main Bailey
Siskind Susser PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/19 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Avanthi Katragadda (Kuck, Charles)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Tue 10/19 11:01 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice. (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
40 40 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD Wed 10/06 11:18 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ added as AUSA. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
39 39 qcref Kinkeade Thu 09/30 6:30 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
Related: [-]
38 38 utility Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer (Public Entry) Thu 09/30 11:18 AM
Case electronically transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:21-cv-01945. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. Modified filed date on 9/30/2021 (axm).
Related: [-]
37 37 ORDER that each plaintiff is severed one from another; Granting Respondent's Motion to Transfer; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/29/2021.(heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
36 36 15 pgs MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/29/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
35 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Reply in support of motion to transfer venue or dismiss complaint filed by Ur JADDOU, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Sunday, September 26, 2021
34 34 NOTICE by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh re32 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Case
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
33 33 NOTICE by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh re28 Response in Opposition to Motion,32 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Supplemental Authority(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit GAO Report
Friday, September 17, 2021
32 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh.(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Transcript of Status Conference,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark Stevens
Thursday, September 16, 2021
31 31 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 09/14/2021, before Judge Messitte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renee A. Ewing, Telephone number 301-344-3227. Total number of pages filed: 28. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2021 Related [+] [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-] , Court Reporter
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
30 30 Telephone Conference Related [+] held on 9/14/2021 for 30 minutes before Judge Peter J. Messitte.(Court Reporter: Renee Ewing) (jmhs, Chambers) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-] status of case
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
29 29 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE and advising counsel/parties of record that a telephone conference will be held on Tuesday, September 14, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel are to provide/email chambers conference call-in information prior to the call at MDD_PJMchambers@mdd.uscourts.gov. (jmhs, Chambers) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
28 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Motion to Transfer Venue or to Dismiss filed by Ur JADDOU, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
27 27 Status Conference held on 9/1/2021 before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court Reporter: Linda Marshall - via Zoom) (tds, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
26 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Lake Vuong on behalf of All Defendants (Vuong, Sarah) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
25 25 2 pgs MEMORANDUM ORDER lifting stay; directing the U.S. Attorney's Office to file a Universal Motion to Transfer appropriate pending court cases within 30 days. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/1/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
24 24 2 pgs MEMORANDUM ORDER scheduling a Zoom Conference for 9/1/2021 at 11:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/26/2021.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
23 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Ur JADDOU, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
22 22 Summons Returned Executed served on Jonathan F. Lenzner, U.S. Attorney on 08/24/2021, filed by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh.(Joseph, Jeff) Modified on 8/30/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
21 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Johnna J Main Bailey. Directing attorney Johnna J Main Bailey to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
20 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gregory H Siskind. Directing attorney Gregory H Siskind to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
19 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declarations of Plaintiffs
18 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Johnna Main Bailey (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9448853.) by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Greg Siskind (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9448847.) by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh re11 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,, Redlined Amended Complaint (Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H Kuck on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kuck, Charles) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
14 14 QC NOTICE:11 Amended Complaint filed by Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Vivek KOTA, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Arulvelan Mani, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Srividya KASTURI, Shivani Arun JAIN, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Syed HUQ, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Dhritiman Sagar, Mohan ABBURU, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Rajul Teredesai, Nikhil Organti, Yuannan CAI, Akhilesh GUPTA, Sameer Raheja, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Ashish GANDHI, Rohit BANSAL, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Abhishek Naik, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Kalyani Vejalla, Sathiraju Undavalli, Vaidehi Mehta, Nikhil Nemade, Anahit CHEEMA, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Bhavik AHIR, Anand DIGGIKAR, Nitin Sindhwani, Yangzhi Lu, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rong Shen, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Vijay Tripathi, Avinash DASARI, Vinod Vijayarajan, parminder singh, Pengfei Wu, Naveen Lakamsany, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Ankur Shah, Nirmit KOTHARI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Asif Shah, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Veeramachaneni, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Vamshi Peechar, Vishal Marneni, Xiao Yu, Rohan Wali, Yogesh Mulay, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Mayank Verma, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Aayushman Misra, Kanthi Charan Narra, Naren Uppuluri, Majid ABDUL, Sagar KALE, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Kalyan Tummala, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Saravanan Ranganathan, Sandeep Repaka, Shruti KHOKA, Jiayu Yu, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sagar Samaria, Amit Uppal, Soumyarupa DE, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Arun Parthasarathy, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Jayesh Sharma, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Karthik Sundaresan, Vijendar GANTA, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Pritish Madhavan, Aiyaz Paniwala, Jing HUANG, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Mohammadershad Shaik, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Praveen BALAJI, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Anshuman Rawat, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Abraham Kulungara, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Ramesh Tirumala, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Moinuddin AHMAD was filed with the following attachments missing - Redline Amended Complaint. To correct this problem, file Redline Amended Complaint using the event Notice (Other) and link Redline Amended Complaint to11 Amended Complaint. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
13 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charles H Kuck. Directing attorney Charles H Kuck to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
12 12 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles H. Kuck by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh. The fee has already been paid.(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
11 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jayesh Sharma, Pritish Madhavan, Syed HUQ, Jing HUANG, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Ashish GANDHI, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Yangzhi Lu, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Vijendar GANTA, Sagar Samaria, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Vijay Tripathi, Rohan Wali, Soumyarupa DE, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Karthik Sundaresan, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Shivani Arun JAIN, Kalyani Vejalla, Rohit BANSAL, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Ankur Shah, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, parminder singh, Saravanan Ranganathan, Vishal Marneni, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Xiao Yu, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Naveen Lakamsany, Nirmit KOTHARI, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Abhishek Naik, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Sameer Raheja, Yuannan CAI, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Nitin Sindhwani, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Avinash DASARI, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Kanthi Charan Narra, Harish Veeramachaneni, Anil Mallu, Mohan ABBURU, Anahit CHEEMA, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Yogesh Mulay, Naren Uppuluri, Nikhil Organti, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Arun Parthasarathy, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Manasi GHATPANDE, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Vaidehi Mehta, Vinod Vijayarajan, Asif Shah, Sathiraju Undavalli, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Aayushman Misra, Mayank Verma, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Vivek KOTA, Rajul Teredesai, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Aditya Varma, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Vamshi Peechar, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Senthil Ramaiyah, Arulvelan Mani, Ramesh Tirumala, Abraham Kulungara, Nikhil Nemade, Anshuman Rawat, Anand DIGGIKAR, Srividya KASTURI, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Shruti KHOKA, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Sandeep Repaka, Moinuddin AHMAD, Amit Uppal, Majid ABDUL, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Kalyan Tummala, Dhritiman Sagar, Aiyaz Paniwala, Praveen BALAJI, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Sagar KALE, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Mohammadershad Shaik, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Jiayu Yu, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Rong Shen, Pengfei Wu, Bhavik AHIR.(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
10 10 Summons Issued 60 days as to Attorney General. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
9 9 NOTICE by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Abraham Kulungara, Naveen Lakamsany, Aniruddha Ashokkumar Laud, Yangzhi Lu, Arun Kumar Madhava Rao, Pritish Madhavan, Rajesh Mahendrakumar, Anil Mallu, Arulvelan Mani, Praveen Kumar Manthri, Vishal Marneni, Vaidehi Mehta, Aayushman Misra, Yogesh Mulay, Nirmal Rajkumar Munuswamy Ramalingam, Abhishek Naik, Kanthi Charan Narra, Sabarinath Navaneethakrishnan, Mahesh Manjunath Nayak, Sujir Pritha Nayak, Nikhil Nemade, Nikhil Organti, Atchuytaramkumar Pachigolla, Aiyaz Paniwala, Arun Parthasarathy, Pankaj Kumar Pathak, Sreerama Kumar Pavani, Vamshi Peechar, Kiran Sasidharan Pillai, Satyanarayana Pusapati, Sameer Raheja, Ramesh Kumar Rajan, Venu Gopal Krishnam Raju Vejella, Senthil Ramaiyah, Harish Krishna Ramaswamy, Saravanan Ranganathan, Anshuman Rawat, Sandeep Repaka, Dhritiman Sagar, Sagar Samaria, Lakshmi Uma Sankar Samudrala, Ramakrishnan Sarveswaran, Ankur Shah, Asif Shah, Mohammadershad Shaik, Jayesh Sharma, Rong Shen, Rasik Ravikant Sheth, Nitin Sindhwani, Karthikeyan Manamcheri Sukumar, Karthik Sundaresan, Sameer Prakash Tejani, Sirish Babu Telukuntla, Rajul Teredesai, Manjunath Terikere-Chikkanna, Kashyapkumar Thaker, Ramesh Tirumala, Vijay Tripathi, Kalyan Tummala, Sathiraju Undavalli, Amit Uppal, Naren Uppuluri, Urvish Prakash Vanzara, Aditya Varma, Harish Veeramachaneni, Kalyani Vejalla, Mayank Verma, Vinod Vijayarajan, Vamsi Krishna Vitla, Rohan Wali, Pengfei Wu, Jiayu Yu, Xiao Yu, parminder singh re2 Complaint (Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
8 8 QC NOTICE:4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,, filed by Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Vivek KOTA, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sagar KALE, Majid ABDUL, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Srividya KASTURI, Shivani Arun JAIN, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Syed HUQ, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Shruti KHOKA, Mohan ABBURU, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Yuannan CAI, Manasi GHATPANDE, Akhilesh GUPTA, Ashish GANDHI, Rohit BANSAL, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Soumyarupa DE, Anahit CHEEMA, Bhavik AHIR, Anand DIGGIKAR, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Vijendar GANTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Avinash DASARI, Jing HUANG, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Praveen BALAJI, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI, Moinuddin AHMAD needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
7 7 QC NOTICE re:2 Complaint filed by Chakrabarti, et el. **The following attachment is missing - Summons for the Attorney General. To correct this problem, file Summons for the Attorney General using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons for the Attorney General to2 Complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur JADDOU, U.S. Attorney. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
5 5 Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission:4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,, of Errata in Motion filed, not signed by movant (Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles H. Kuck (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9425508.) by Mohan ABBURU, Majid ABDUL, Sreedhar Reddy ADAPA, Bhavik AHIR, Moinuddin AHMAD, Prabhu Samyukth ANKALA, Sivakumar BAKTHAVACHALAM, Praveen BALAJI, Senthil Anand BALAKRISHNAN, Rohit BANSAL, Vamsidhar BHAGAVATHULA, Kavitha BHASKARAN, Yuannan CAI, Atreyi CHAKRABARTI, Dasaratha CHANDRAMOULI, Anahit CHEEMA, Hemantha CHINNADURAI, Avinash DASARI, Soumyarupa DE, Sreekanth DHANEKULA, Anand DIGGIKAR, Ramlock DOMMARAJU, Kiran Kumar Reddy ENDREDDY, Jeevan GAMBHIR, Ashish GANDHI, Vijendar GANTA, Manasi GHATPANDE, Sunitha GIRIDHARAN, Akhilesh GUPTA, Anil Kumar GUPTA, Jing HUANG, Syed HUQ, Lakshmi ISUKAPALLY, Shivani Arun JAIN, Srinivasa JAMPANA, Ajay JOGLEKAR, Sagar KALE, Vineetha KALVAKUNTA, Santosh Kumar KANCHA, Praveen KANNEGANTI, Srividya KASTURI, Veera Venkata Rama Ra KASULA, Avanthi KATRAGADDA, Sachin KHANDEKAR, Shruti KHOKA, Sachin KIVLEKAR, Murali Krishna Reddy KONDA, Vivek KOTA, Nirmit KOTHARI, Chaithanya Botta KRISHNA, Sujay Shyamsundar KULKARNI(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
3 3 QC NOTICE:2 Complaint filed by Chakrabarti, et al. was filed incorrectly. **All parties were not added to the case. There are 74 additional remaining Plaintiffs to be added to the system. The Clerk will add these parties but please note for the future that all parties must be added at the time of filing the initial complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
2 2 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Atreyi Chakrabarti, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Jaddou.(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
1 1 QC NOTICE: **Complaint has not been filed. Please file the Complaint or notify the court of your intentions. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number 0416-9413447(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/30/2021.]
Related: [-]