New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00595
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2021
Last checked: Friday Oct 01, 2021 3:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Jaeson Birnbaum (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel Loss
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Southern District Of New York
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/01/2021 3:53 AM EDT
Monday, September 20, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Jaeson Birnbaum. (jm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
Arrest/Surrender of Jaeson Birnbaum. (jm)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF as to Jaeson Birnbaum. (jm)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: AUSA Dan Loss is present for the Government; Pretrial was present. Michael Giordano appeared with the Defendant. Defendant was sworn and the Court conducted a Rule 5 hearing. Defendant waived indictment. Arraignment as to Jaeson Birnbaum (1) Count 1 held on 9/28/2021. Plea entered by Jaeson Birnbaum (1) Guilty as to Count 1., As to Jaeson Birnbaum. Bail was set and conditions are to be met by 10/12/21. PSI was ordered. (See Transcript for details)( Sentencing set for 1/6/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (jm)
Related: [-]
Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Jaeson Birnbaum. (jm)
Related: [-]
2 2 INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Jaeson Birnbaum (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty:Initial Appearance as to Jaeson Birnbaum held on 9/28/2021. Deft. is present with attorney Samuel Braverman; AUSA Daniel Loss is also present. Bail is set as: $200,000 PRB secured by $200,000 cash or property; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/DNJ & SD FL; surrender travel documents & no new applications; supervision as directed by PTS; drug testing/treatment as directed by PTS; mental health evaluation/treatment as directed by PTS; Deft. not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon. Deft. to be released on own signature with remaining conditions to be met by 10/12/21. (jm)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Jaeson Birnbaum. (jm)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order Pursuant to Rule 5(f) by USA as to Jaeson Birnbaum. (jm)
Related: [-]
6 6 PRB Bond Entered as to Jaeson Birnbaum in amount of $ $200,000. (jm)
Related: [-]