California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 2:21-cv-07832
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2021
Terminated:Aug 04, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 31, 2022 1:56 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES 1-10
Defendant
Del Amo Associates, LLC
Represented By
Patrick A Maher
Reisz Siderman Eisenberg, Apc
contact info
Defendant
Beverages & More, Inc.
Mediator (ADR Panel)
John K Mitchell
Represented By
John Kevin Mitchell
Law Offices Of John K Mitchell
contact info
Plaintiff
Ed Hull
Represented By
Anoush Hakimi
Law Office Of Hakimi And Shahriari
contact info
Laura Anne Steven
Law Office Of Hakimi And Shahriari
contact info
Kyle W Wilson
Law Office Of Hakimi And Shahriari
contact info
Peter Shahriari
Law Office Of Hakimi And Shahriari
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 04, 2022
35 35 order Dismissing Case Thu 08/04 2:19 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff Ed Hull's action against Defendants Del Amo Associates, LLC; Beverages & More, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will be responsible for its own fees and costs. RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case34 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
34 34 stip Dismiss Case Wed 08/03 6:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 41 (a)(1) and (2) filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull.(Attorney Lauren Rae Davis added to party Ed Hull(pty:pla))(Davis, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
33 33 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/12 12:01 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. A Joint Notice of Settlement was filed on July 11, 2022. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 60 days. The Court now sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for September 12, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a notice of dismissal is filed by noon on September 9, 2022. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
32 32 notice Settlement Mon 07/11 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Signed Jointly filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull. (Davis, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 05/13 8:25 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Laura Anne Steven counsel for Plaintiff Ed Hull. Laura Anne Steven is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull. (Steven, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
30 30 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 03/17 8:07 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull.. (Steven, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
29 29 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/15 11:40 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ed Hull, upon Defendant Beverages & More, Inc. served on 3/11/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon c/o CSC - LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE c/o Trudy Desbiens in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hakimi, Anoush)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
28 28 misc Disclosure Mon 03/14 5:27 PM
DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Del Amo Associates, LLC (Maher, Patrick)
Related: [-]
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/14 5:22 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition24 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Del Amo Associates, LLC.(Maher, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
26 26 service Summons Issued Tue 03/01 2:59 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint24 as to Defendant Beverages & More, Inc. (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
25 25 notice Summons Request Mon 02/28 12:36 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition24 filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull. (Steven, Laura)
Related: [-]
24 24 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 02/28 12:28 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull(Steven, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
23 23 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 02/22 10:55 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/18 6:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Del Amo Associates, LLC.(Maher, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
21 21 minutes Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/15 12:33 PM
MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Matter does not settle. Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, the Court identifies Plaintiff as a "high frequency litigant" and for that reason declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state Unruh Act claim. The Court sets the following: Discovery Cutoff: June 24, 2022; Expert Discovery Cutoff: July 20, 2022; Motion Hearing Cutoff: August 19, 2022; Pretrial Conference: September 15, 2022 at 8:30 a.m.; Court Trial: September 27, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are free to amend pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 up to February 28, 2022. Thereafter, any further amendments must be made by motion under Rule 16. Court Reporter: Katie E Thibodeaux. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
20 20 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement Thu 02/10 4:24 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Defendant Del Amo Associates, LLC: Mediation held on 1/31/2022 and 2/3/2022. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Maher, Patrick)
Related: [-]
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 02/10 8:56 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 02/14/2022 status conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
18 18 misc Response Fri 01/21 5:53 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Del Amo Associates, LLCto Statement15 (Maher, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
17 17 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Tue 01/11 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) John K Mitchell has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
16 16 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Assigned) - (ADR-2) Tue 12/28 5:39 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: ADA Access Litigation. Filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull(Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
15 15 misc Statement Tue 12/21 9:55 AM
STATEMENT of Case filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22),14 . (Steven, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
14 14 order Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) Wed 12/08 1:15 PM
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting13 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 2/4/2022. The Court sets a status conference for 2/14/2022 at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
13 13 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Tue 11/30 4:08 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Del Amo Associates, LLC. (Maher, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11/17 6:34 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ed Hull, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon D. John Miller in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hakimi, Anoush)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
11 11 10 pgs order Order Fri 11/12 1:17 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See attached document for details) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 11/10 5:44 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-07832 GW(JEMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 11/10 12:29 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Maher, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
8 8 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 10/26 5:14 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Del Amo Associates, LLC answer now due 12/2/2021, filed by Defendant Del Amo Associates, LLC.(Attorney Patrick A Maher added to party Del Amo Associates, LLC(pty:dft))(Maher, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
7 7 8 pgs order Order Mon 10/04 9:27 AM
INITIAL ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (See document for details) (vmun)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/01 4:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Del Amo Associates, LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Fri 10/01 4:43 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV11C
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 10/01 7:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ed Hull, (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 10/01 7:15 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull. (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Fri 10/01 7:15 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Ed Hull. (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/01 7:14 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32081768 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Ed Hull. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Ed Hull(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]