Bean v. Westbrook et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Helen Gillmor |
Referred: | Barry M Kurren |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00353 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 8:43 PM HST |
Defendant
James Alexander Westbrook
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe Corporations 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Entities 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Partnerships 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Trust Entities 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Julie Beth Bean
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS)
Terminated: 09/15/2014
|
|
Defendant
Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
Terminated: 09/15/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Terminated: 10/15/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
50 | 50
minutes
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Link
Wed 04/01 8:44 AM
EO: In light of48 Stipulation and Order, all pending dates and deadlines are hereby TERMINATED.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2015 | ||
49 | 49
1
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 03/31 12:09 PM
Clerk's Transmittal Letter to Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, State of Hawaii re: "Stipulation to Remand to the Circuit Court of the Second Circuit of the State of Hawaii and Preserve Defendant James Alexander Westbrook's Motion to Join Cheryl Westbrook as a Necessary Party" (ECF No.48 ). (ecs, ) |
|
48 | 48
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 03/31 11:33 AM
STIPULATION TO REMAND TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE SECOND CIRCUIT OF THE STATE OF HAWAII AND PRESERVE DEFENDANT JAMES ALEXANDER WESTBROOK'S MOTION TO JOIN CHERYL WESTBROOK AS A NECESSARY PARTY. Order signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 3/31/2015. **Motions terminated: 42 MOTION Defendant James Alexander Westbrook's Motion to Join Cheryl Westbrook as a Necessary Party filed by James Alexander Westbrook, 44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Julie Beth Bean. (ecs, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |