New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert B Kugler
Case #: 8:21-cv-17947
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseAttorney Discipline
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2021
Terminated:Nov 08, 2021
Case in other court:SUPREME COURT OF NEW JERSEY, D-53-00020
Last checked: Thursday Mar 31, 2022 4:31 AM EDT
Notice Only
attydisc
Respondent
THOMAS MARTIN KEELEY-CAIN
Represented By
THOMAS M. KEELEY-CAIN
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, November 08, 2021
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 11/08 9:52 AM
***Miscellaneous Civil Case Terminated. (dc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
1 1 utility Remark (public) Fri 10/01 1:57 PM
Copy of Order D-53-20 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey reprimanding THOMAS MARTIN KEELEY-CAIN. (dc, )
Related: [-]