North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Kenneth D Bell
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 5:21-cv-00143
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2021
Terminated:Oct 14, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 31, 2022 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Viva Life, LLC
Represented By
Christopher D. Tomlinson
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Defendant
Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher D. Tomlinson
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Defendant
Sona MedSpa International, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher D. Tomlinson
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Defendant
Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC
Represented By
Christopher D. Tomlinson
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Plaintiff
Vitality Anti-Aging Center and Med Spa, PLLC
Represented By
Matthew Kyle Rogers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
27 27 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark Wed 10/19 2:58 PM
REPORT on the Determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (mek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Friday, October 14, 2022
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/14 8:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by Vitality Anti-Aging Center and Med Spa, PLLC (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Rogers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/11 12:17 PM
ORDER granting 24 Consent Motion for Stipulated Injuction. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/11/2022. (mek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 10/05 10:33 AM
Consent MOTION to Enter Stipulated Injunction by Vitality Anti-Aging Center and Med Spa, PLLC (Rogers, Matthew) Modified on 10/5/2022 to convert to motion (mek)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 09/23 12:07 PM
ORDER directing the parties to file a Stipulation of Dismissal in this case, or in the alternative request an extension of time to file such dismissal, on or before October 21, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/23/22. (mga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
22 22 adr Report of Mediation Wed 09/21 7:59 PM
REPORT of Mediation. Outcome of Mediation: Completely Settled. (Ladenheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Thu 08/04 7:35 AM
ORDER granting with modification 20 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Amend Pre-Trial Order and Case Management Plan. The scheduling order deadlines are revised as follows: Plaintiff's Expert Reports October 7, 2022; Defendants' Expert Reports October 28, 2022 ; completion of discovery November 18, 2022; mediation November 18, 2022; dispositive motions December 21, 2022; and trial term May 15, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/3/22. (mga)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 08/04 7:38 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial reset for 5/15/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (mga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
20 20 motion Discovery Wed 08/03 10:07 AM
Joint MOTION for Discovery Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Amend Pre-trial Order and Case Management Plan by Vitality Anti-Aging Center and Med Spa, PLLC. Responses due by 8/17/2022 (Rogers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Attached to Joint Motion
Thursday, May 12, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 05/12 11:28 AM
ORDER granting 18 Consent Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Defendants' First Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Document Production To Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall have up to and including June 16, 2022 to respond to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/12/2022. (mek)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/12 9:16 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Document Production to Plaintiff by Vitality Anti-Aging Center and Med Spa, PLLC. Responses due by 5/26/2022 (Rogers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
17 17 order Protective Order Thu 02/03 7:39 AM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/2/22. (mga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
16 16 motion Protective Order Wed 02/02 2:29 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order (for Entry of Consent Protective Order) by Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc., Sona MedSpa International, Inc., Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC, Viva Life, LLC. Responses due by 2/16/2022 (Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/16 8:22 AM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: three to four days. Discovery due by 8/17/2022. Motions due by 9/21/2022. Mediator Designation deadline set for 2/18/2022. Mediation deadline set for 8/17/2022. Jury Trial set for 2/21/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/15/2021. (mek)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Wed 12/15 12:14 PM
CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Rogers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Tue 11/23 9:42 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 12/14/2021. (nvc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Certificate of Initial Settlement Conference Mon 11/22 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/22 4:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sona MedSpa International, Inc. (Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/22 4:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc. (Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/22 3:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viva Life, LLC (Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/22 3:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC (Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/22 3:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc., Sona MedSpa International, Inc., Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC, Viva Life, LLC.(Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 11/12 2:45 PM
ORDER granting 6 Defendants' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint , 1 Complaint. Defendants shall file an Answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 22, 2021. In the alternative, the parties may file a Notice Of Settlement on or before November 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/12/21. (mga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 11, 2021
6 6 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/11 2:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc., Sona MedSpa International, Inc., Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC, Viva Life, LLC. (Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/20 4:29 PM
ORDER granting 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint , 1 Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including November 15, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/20/21. (mga)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time Wed 10/20 3:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc., Sona MedSpa International, Inc., Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC, Viva Life, LLC. (Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
3 3 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark Mon 10/04 10:48 AM
REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding trademark numbers contained in complaint. (nvc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10/01 12:28 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/01 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5249476), filed by Vitality Anti-Aging and Med Spa, PLLC.(Rogers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/01 12:26 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (nvc)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Bell Civil Standing Order Requiring ISC Fri 10/01 12:26 PM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases] assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)
Related: [-]