Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Edmund A Sargus
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:21-cv-04921
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2021
Terminated:Mar 03, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 02, 2022 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Wallick Communities
160 West Main St., Suite 200
New Albany, OH 43054
Represented By
David T Ball
Rosenberg & Ball Co., Lpa
contact info
Thomas Joseph Mulvey
Rosenberg & Ball
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Wiggins
5011 Godown Rd. Apt E
Columbus, OH 43220
Represented By
Rachel Sabo
The Friedmann Firm
contact info
Rachel Sabo-Friedmann
The Friedmann Firm LLC
contact info
Jamie Rae Bailey
The Friedmann Firm
contact info
Peter Friedmann
The Friedmann Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 03, 2023
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/03 11:42 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (daf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/01 4:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Richard Wiggins. (Bailey, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 08/22 11:29 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 10/25/2022. Dispositive motions due by 11/29/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/22/2022. (agm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 08/19 12:32 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 10/25/2022. by Plaintiff Richard Wiggins. (Bailey, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, July 21, 2022
minutes Discovery Conference Thu 07/21 10:43 AM
Statistical Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Discovery Conference held on 7/21/2022. (agm)
Related: [-]
motion Miscellaneous Relief Compel Thu 07/21 10:54 AM
Joint ORAL MOTION for Discovery Conference and MOTION to Compel. (agm)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Compel Thu 07/21 10:56 AM
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion for Discovery Conference; granting Oral Motion to Compel. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/21/2022. (agm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
med Notice Designating Mediator Wed 06/01 10:05 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: David P Shouvlin assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in July 2022, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
9 9 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Fri 05/20 10:43 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in July 2022 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 5/31/2022 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/03 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Mulvey for Defendant Wallick Communities (Mulvey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
7 7 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/21 11:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Settlement Conference set for 4/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Jury Trial set for 5/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 311 - Columbus before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Motions in Limine due by 5/1/2023. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/21/2022. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 FPTO Form
Thursday, January 13, 2022
6 6 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Thu 01/13 4:12 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The January 19, 2022 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 3/10/2022. Motions to Amend due by 3/10/2022. Initial Disclosures due by 2/4/2022. Discovery due by 8/26/2022. Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2022. Primary Expert due by 7/1/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/12/2022. Settlement Demand due by 2/25/2022. Response to Settlement Demand due by 3/18/2022. Mediation Deadline: 7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/13/2022. (daf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
5 5 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 01/11 2:56 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Richard Wiggins. (Bailey, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 01/05 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 1/19/2022 12:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/03 9:23 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Wallick Communities. (Ball, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/15 12:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Wallick Communities on 10/6/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Bailey, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/04 12:12 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wallick Communities ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8526017), filed by Richard Wiggins. (Bailey, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit