VINCENZETTI v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond P Moore |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-02681 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity - Employment |
Case Filed: | Oct 01, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 31, 2022 3:48 AM MDT |
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Vincenzetti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alicia Grumet
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
77 | 77
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Mon 03/04 10:20 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re:74 Joint Motion for Extension of Time filed by attorney Don J. Foty. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
76 | 76
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 03/01 4:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND EXPERT DEADLINES Before the court is the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend the Expert Deadlines in the Scheduling Order. After reviewing the motion and applicable law, the court ORDERS the following deadlines in the case: Plaintiffs' expert designations: May 3, 2024 Report furnished by: May 3, 2024 Defendants expert designations: June 7, 2024 Report furnished by: June 7, 2024 Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/1/2024.(norlin, ) |
|
75 | 75
order
Memorandum
Fri 03/01 3:35 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding74 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports filed by Jennifer Vincenzetti, Alicia Grumet. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/1/2024. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec) |
|
74 | 74
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 03/01 2:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports by Plaintiffs Alicia Grumet, Jennifer Vincenzetti.(Foty, Don) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) |