Maryland District Court
Case #: 8:21-cr-00348
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Oct 02, 2021 3:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Brian McQuade (1)
Represented By
Kristina Leslie
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Caroline Collins
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Maryland
contact info
Caitlin R Cottingham
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/02/2021 4:00 AM EDT
Thursday, September 02, 2021
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Brian McQuade (1) count(s) 1-2. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION and ORDER to Seal as to Brian McQuade.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 9/2/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]