New York Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Wendy A Kinsella
Case #: 5:21-bk-30770
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2021
Terminated:Oct 04, 2021

Debtor
The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.
PO Box 457
Syracuse, NY 13209-0457
Represented By
Camille Wolnik Hill
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee Office 10 Broad Street, Room 105
Utica, NY 13501


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
13 13 1 pgs audio Wed 12/22 4:54 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/22/2021 10:41:39 AM ]. File Size [ 2372 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:53 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
12 12 order Transfer Case (Intra-District) Mon 10/04 11:36 AM
Sua Sponte Order of Recusal and Transfer . New Case Number is 21-30770 6. (Straile, T) Modified on 10/4/2021 (Cardinal, Lisa)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Shorten Time Mon 10/04 11:29 AM
Motion to Shorten Time Related [+] (Application for Entry of Order Reducing Time for Hearing on Wage Motion) Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-] 10 Generic Motion10
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Hill Affidavit
10 10 motion ZGeneric Motion Mon 10/04 11:27 AM
Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing Debtor to Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries and Benefits; (ii) Authorizing the Continuation of Employee Benefit Programs in the Ordinary Course of Business; and (iii) Directing Banks to Honor Prepetition Checks for Payment of Prepetition Wage, Salary and Benefit Obligations Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Interim Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Final Order
9 9 motion Shorten Time Mon 10/04 11:06 AM
Motion to Shorten Time Related [+] (Application Reducing Time for Notice on Cash Management Motion) Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-] 8 Generic Motion8
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Hill Affidavit
8 8 motion ZGeneric Motion Mon 10/04 10:59 AM
Motion for Order Authorizing (i) Continued Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts; (ii) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System; and (iii) Continued Use of Existing Business Forms Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Interim Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Final Order
7 7 motion Shorten Time Mon 10/04 10:31 AM
Motion to Shorten Time Related [+] Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral6
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Hill Affidavit
6 6 16 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral Mon 10/04 10:28 AM
Motion to Use of Cash Collateral Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Interim Order
5 5 misc Mailing Matrix and/or Certification of Mailing Matrix Mon 10/04 10:07 AM
Certification of Mailing Matrix and Mailing Matrix Filed. (20 Largest Unsecured Creditor Matrix, together with Certification) Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Mailing Matrix and/or Certification of Mailing Matrix Mon 10/04 9:50 AM
Certification of Mailing Matrix and Mailing Matrix Filed. Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Resolution Mon 10/04 9:49 AM
Corporate Resolution Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 10/04 9:46 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-]
1 1 47 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Attorney Use Mon 10/04 9:31 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V, Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by The New York Bakery of Syracuse, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 01/2/2022. (Hill, Camille)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 10/04 9:33 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 21-30770 5] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11139907, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 10/04 12:11 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. Transferred to Utica. (Straile, T)
Related: [-]