Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03100
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2021
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alex Hart Raley, Jr.
Represented By
Alex Hart Raley, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
26 26 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 09/17 12:01 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 09/13 1:58 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
24 24 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Thu 04/07 12:09 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Transcript filed
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
23 23 misc Withdrawal Tue 04/05 1:29 PM
Notice and Withdrawal of Certain Pleadings by the Liquidating Trustee Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to Approve filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,21 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,22 Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, April 01, 2022
22 22 notice Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Fri 04/01 3:27 PM
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to Approve filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,21 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
21 21 motion Expedite Hearing Fri 04/01 3:26 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to Approve filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
20 20 motion Approve Fri 04/01 3:25 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under FRBP 9019 filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
19 19 court Transcript filed Fri 03/25 1:40 PM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 3/24/2022, Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 06/23/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, LLC, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Robert Westermann.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 04/1/2022. Redaction Request Due By 04/15/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/25/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/23/2022. (Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-] 18 Status Conference held and continued; Appearance(s): David Swan; Neil McCullagh (Re: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia.
Thursday, March 24, 2022
18 18 court Hearing continued Thu 03/24 12:28 PM
Status Conference held and continued; Appearance(s): David Swan; Neil McCullagh Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, March 10, 2022
17 17 misc Request for Hearing Thu 03/10 5:15 PM
Notice and Request for Hearing of Status Conference filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Thu 02/17 2:46 PM
Third Stipulation and Consent Order Preserving Assets Pending Adjudication of Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, January 31, 2022
15 15 misc Statement Mon 01/31 10:49 AM
Statement (Mediator's Report) filed by Christian K. Vogel of Vogel & Cromwell, LLC on behalf of Christian K. Vogel. (Vogel, Christian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
14 14 answer Amended Answer Thu 01/06 3:51 PM
Amended Answer of Alex Hart Raley, Jr. Related [+] filed by Neil E. McCullagh of Spotts Fain PC on behalf of Alex Hart Raley Jr.. (McCullagh, Neil)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,11 Answer to Complaint filed by Alex Hart Raley
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Wed 12/22 3:26 PM
Second Stipulation and Consent Order Preserving Assets Pending Adjudication of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, December 20, 2021
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/20 3:28 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Neil E. McCullagh of Spotts Fain PC on behalf of Alex Hart Raley Jr.. (McCullagh, Neil)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion to Stay filed by Alex Hart Raley,11 Answer to Complaint filed by Alex Hart Raley
Friday, December 17, 2021
11 11 answer None Fri 12/17 3:40 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Neil E. McCullagh of Spotts Fain PC on behalf of Alex Hart Raley Jr.. (McCullagh, Neil)
Related: [-] 1
10 10 motion Stay Fri 12/17 3:34 PM
Motion to Stay Alex Hart Raley, Jr.'s Motion to Stay, Transfer Venue, or Dismiss filed by Neil E. McCullagh of Spotts Fain PC on behalf of Alex Hart Raley Jr.. (McCullagh, Neil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
9 9 order Stipulation and Order Tue 10/19 3:53 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order Preserving Assets Pending Adjudication of Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
8 8 court Hearing held Tue 10/12 1:37 PM
Hearing held; SETTLED. Appearance(s): David Swan; Neil McCullagh Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,6 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, October 08, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 10/08 11:21 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,6 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
6 6 motion Expedite Hearing Fri 10/08 11:20 AM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
5 5 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 10/08 11:19 AM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Raley and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/06 2:55 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 10/05 3:55 PM
Summons and notice issued to Alex Hart Raley Jr. Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, October 01, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 10/01 3:05 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03100 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 33898417, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 10/01 3:04 PM
Adversary case 21-03100 Complaint against Alex Hart Raley Jr. filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]