Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:21-cv-05733
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2021
Terminated:Nov 07, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 02, 2022 1:44 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1-20
Plaintiff
MG Premium Ltd
Represented By
Spencer D Freeman
Freeman Law Firm Inc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 03, 2023
38 38 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Contempt Thu 08/03 2:22 PM
ORDER granting35 Motion for Contempt. IT IS ORDERED that: MG Premium or its designee is entitled to be the registrar of record for the domain name Daft.sex; MG Premium or its designee is entitled to be the registrar of record for the domain name Dsex.to; MG Premium or its designee is entitled to be the registrar of record for the domain name Biqle.org; MG Premium or its designee is entitled to be the owner of record of the Twitter (or X) account @Daftpost; and MG Premium or its designee is entitled to ownership of the accounts daftsex.github.io and daftpost.github.io. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
37 37 misc Errata Tue 06/06 1:35 PM
ERRATA re36 Declaration of Jason Tucker by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Declaration Tue 06/06 1:30 PM
Supplemental DECLARATION of Jason Tucker filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re35 Supplemental MOTION for Contempt (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Contempt Tue 06/06 1:29 PM
Supplemental MOTION for Contempt , filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd. Noting Date 6/6/2023, (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 22, 2023
34 34 misc Status Report Mon 05/22 9:35 AM
STATUS REPORT re Service Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
33 33 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Contempt Thu 03/16 12:51 PM
ORDER. Vasily Kharchenko is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING why he should not be subject to a bench warrant, to an order holding him in contempt, or to monetary sanctions. He should do so within 30 days of this order. MG Premium shall use its best efforts to serve a copy of this order on Kharchenko and apprise the Court of those efforts. MG Premium's30 Motion is, to this extent, GRANTED. The Court will not yet impose such sanctions, and for reasons previously addressed, will not at this time enjoin non-parties from conducting business with Kharchenko. That portion of MG Premium's Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
32 32 respm Declaration Tue 12/20 4:02 PM
DECLARATION of Jason Tucker filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re30 MOTION for Contempt of Permanent Injunction (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Declaration Tue 12/20 4:02 PM
DECLARATION of Steve Salway filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re30 MOTION for Contempt of Permanent Injunction (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Contempt Tue 12/20 4:01 PM
MOTION for Contempt of Permanent Injunction , filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd. Noting Date 12/20/2022, (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 07, 2022
29 29 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Mon 11/07 12:25 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office with copy of28 Judgment. (MW)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Judgment - Default Mon 11/07 11:45 AM
ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. DEFENDANT Vasily Kharchenko is PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from using on or in connection with any product or service or the manufacture, importation, exportation, sale, offering for sale, distribution, advertising, promotion, labeling or packaging of any product or service, or from using for any commercial purpose whatsoever any copyrighted work of MG Premium, Ltd. DEFENDANT Vasily Kharchenko, in accordance with 17 U.S.C. § 504(c)(2), shall PAY TO PLAINTIFF statutory damages in the amount of $32,145,000, with interest on these principal amounts according to the statutory rate pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 1961(a). DEFENDANT Vasily Kharchenko, in accordance with 17 U.S.C. § 502(a), shall PAY TO PLAINTIFF Plaintiff's reasonable attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $27,297.50. Verisign, Inc., the operator of the.COM registry, change the registrar of record for the domain names Daftsex.com, Artsporn.com, Daxab.com, and Biqle.com to MG Premium's registrar of choice, EuroDNS, and that EuroDNS change the registrant of the domain names Daftsex.com, Artsporn.com, Daxab.com, and Biqle.com to MG Premium. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
27 27 respm Declaration Thu 10/20 11:51 AM
Second DECLARATION of Jason Tucker filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re25 MOTION for Default Judgment ReNewed (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Declaration Thu 10/20 11:44 AM
Second DECLARATION of Spencer Freeman filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re25 MOTION for Default Judgment ReNewed (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Default Judgment Thu 10/20 11:43 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment ReNewed , filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd. Noting Date 10/20/2022, (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 29, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 09/29 8:30 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's20 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/29 12:44 PM
Case Management deadline: check on status of case on 3/29/2023. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
23 23 respm Declaration Wed 08/31 4:38 PM
DECLARATION of Spencer Freeman filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re20 MOTION for Default Judgment (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Declaration Wed 08/31 4:37 PM
DECLARATION of Andreas Andreou filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re20 MOTION for Default Judgment (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Declaration Wed 08/31 4:36 PM
DECLARATION of Jason Tucker filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re20 MOTION for Default Judgment (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Default Judgment Wed 08/31 4:36 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment , filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd. Noting Date 8/31/2022, (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 01, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Mon 08/01 3:59 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Default against Defendant Vasily Kharchenko. By deputy clerk on behalf of Clerk Ravi Subramanian.(MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
18 18 respm Declaration Wed 07/27 2:35 PM
DECLARATION of Spencer Freeman filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re17 MOTION for Default against Vasily Kharchenko, (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Default Wed 07/27 2:35 PM
MOTION for Default against Vasily Kharchenko,, filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd. Noting Date 7/27/2022, (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
16 16 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Wed 06/29 9:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE10 MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
15 15 misc Praecipe to Attach Document Thu 06/23 11:46 AM
PRAECIPE to attach document Corrected Signature re11 Declaration by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 06/21 10:41 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Vasily Kharchenko (ZMG)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Tue 06/21 10:38 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re11 Declaration. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ZMG)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
12 12 respm Declaration Fri 06/17 9:57 AM
DECLARATION of Spencer Freeman filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re10 MOTION for Leave Alternative Service (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Declaration Fri 06/17 9:57 AM
DECLARATION of Jason Tucker filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re10 MOTION for Leave Alternative Service (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Leave Fri 06/17 9:56 AM
MOTION for Leave Alternative Service , filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd. Noting Date 6/17/2022, (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/17 9:30 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by MG Premium Ltd.(Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, January 10, 2022
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 01/10 1:56 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF' S EX PARTE5 MOTION FOR EARLY DISCOVERY signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(ZMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
7 7 respm Declaration Wed 12/08 11:01 AM
DECLARATION of Spencer Freeman filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re5 MOTION for Discovery (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Declaration Wed 12/08 11:00 AM
DECLARATION of Jason Tucker filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd re5 MOTION for Discovery (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Discovery Wed 12/08 10:59 AM
MOTION for Discovery , filed by Plaintiff MG Premium Ltd. Noting Date 12/8/2021, (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 14, 2021
4 4 6 pgs order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Thu 10/14 3:36 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/29/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/5/2022. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/14 10:03 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by MG Premium Ltd (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
2 2 56 pgs utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Thu 10/07 9:38 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (SP)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/07 9:15 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
Related: [-]
utility Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Thu 10/07 10:03 AM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) MG Premium Ltd must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/14/2021. (SP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
1 1 146 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/04 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Does 1-20 with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Spencer D Freeman added to party MG Premium Ltd(pty:pla), filed by MG Premium Ltd.(Freeman, Spencer) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/4/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7276412
Att: 1 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet