Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Mark E Walker
Referred: Martin A Fitzpatrick
Case #: 4:21-cv-00404
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2021
Terminated:Jun 22, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 02, 2022 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
TELEPERFORMANCE
Represented By
ARLENE KARIN KLINE
Akerman Llp - West Palm Beach Fl
contact info
ANA C DOWELL
Akerman Llp - Atlanta Ga
contact info
ERIC ANDREW GORDON
Akerman Llp - West Palm Beach Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA BUTLER
Represented By
MARIE A MATTOX
Marie A Mattox Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Tue 09/20 9:06 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re40 Clerk's Judgment (rcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
40 40 order Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion) Wed 06/22 8:39 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 39 ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 9/20/2022 (rcb)
Related: [-]
39 39 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/22 8:35 AM
ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's motion, ECF No. 38 , is GRANTED. The Clerk must enter judgment stating, "Plaintiff's claims against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. The parties will each bear their attorney's fees and costs." The Clerk must close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/22/2022. (rcb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
38 38 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 06/21 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANGELA BUTLER (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 18, 2022
37 37 misc Status Report Sat 06/18 2:21 PM
STATUS REPORT (by Plaintiff) by ANGELA BUTLER. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 06/14 7:50 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: Set Deadlines-6/13/2022 Status Report (rcb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/14 7:52 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 7/14/2022 . (rcb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 06/14 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2022 09:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGee Courtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
35 35 misc Status Report Mon 06/13 4:03 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery as of June 13, 2022 (Defendant's) by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Pretrial Order Mon 06/13 10:49 AM
ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Attorney Conference to take place by 9/15/2022 . Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/22/2022 . Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2022 09:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/13/2022. (rcb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
33 33 misc Notice of Mediation re Scheduling Mon 06/06 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling Mediator Selection and Mediation Date, Time, and Place by TELEPERFORMANCE (DOWELL, ANA)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/13 8:34 AM
Set Deadlines- Status Report due by 6/13/2022 . (rcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
32 32 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 04/27 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order Dated April 25, 2022 by TELEPERFORMANCE re31 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
31 31 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/25 2:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 29 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. That motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties must confer, agree on, and file with this Court deposition dates on or before 5:00 p.m. EST Wednesday, 4/27/2022 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 04/25/2022. (rcb)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/25 11:18 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re29 MOTION to Compel Discovery Dates Prior to Discovery Deadlines filed by ANGELA BUTLER. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, April 22, 2022
29 29 motion Compel Fri 04/22 2:58 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery Dates Prior to Discovery Deadlines by TELEPERFORMANCE. (DOWELL, ANA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/12 7:27 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 5/12/2022 . (rcb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
28 28 misc Status Report Mon 04/11 4:03 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery as of April 11, 2022 by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 03/25 2:14 PM
ORDER DENYING 24 MOTION TO COMPEL. In light of Plaintiff's representations, Defendant's motion to compel is DENIED as moot. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 03/25/2022. (rcb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
26 26 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/24 7:48 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION to Compel filed by ANGELA BUTLER. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/18 2:59 PM
ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE. REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE. Plaintiff is ordered to file an expedited response to Defendant's motion on or before 3/25/2022 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 03/18/2022. (rcb)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Compel Fri 03/18 2:16 PM
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY. (DOWELL, ANA) Modified to edit title on 3/18/2022 (rcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Thursday, March 10, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 03/10 8:50 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: Status Report Due 3/9/2022 (rcb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/10 8:51 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 4/11/2022 . (rcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
23 23 misc Status Report Wed 03/09 4:04 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery as of March 7, 2022 (Defendant's) by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/03 10:15 AM
ORDER ADMITTING ANA C. DOWELL PRO HAC VICE. The 21 motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 03/03/2022. (rcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/02 2:57 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ana C. Dowell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6763351.) by TELEPERFORMANCE. (DOWELL, ANA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 24, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/24 1:59 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE.Accordingly, Ms. Dowell's 19 motion is DENIED without prejudice to renew once she can demonstrate compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 02/24/2022. (rcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/23 5:10 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ana C. Dowell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6728803.) by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, February 10, 2022
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/10 7:41 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 3/9/2022 . (sjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
18 18 misc Status Report Wed 02/09 4:13 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery as of February 9, 2022 (Defendant's) by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/10 10:35 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 2/9/2022 . (rcb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
17 17 misc Status Report Fri 01/07 3:41 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery as of January 7, 2022 (Joint) by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/09 9:00 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 1/9/2022 . (rcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 12/08 2:31 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery as of December 6, 2021 (Joint) by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
15 15 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation Thu 12/02 9:48 AM
SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER. The Jury Trial is set for the trial period that begins on Monday, 10/17/2022 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. The discovery deadline is extended to 6/27/2022 . The deadline for filing summary-judgment motions is 21 days ( 7/18/2022 )after the discovery deadline. Mediation to take place by 7/25/2022 . Mediation Report due by 8/8/2022 . Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/02/2021. (rcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Wed 12/01 9:07 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 11/24 10:32 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:2 Scheduling Order, (rcb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
13 13 misc Rule 26 Disclosures Thu 11/18 9:50 AM
RULE 26 Disclosures by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
12 12 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 11/17 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by ANGELA BUTLER (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
11 11 misc Status Report Tue 11/09 3:44 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 11/08 11:30 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:2 Scheduling Order, (rcb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/08 11:32 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 11/8/2021 . (rcb) Modified to reset status report deadline on 11/8/2021 (rcb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/08 11:35 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 12/8/2021 . (rcb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 11/05 3:33 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/25 9:39 AM
ORDER DENYING 3 MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant's 3 motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/25/2021. (rcb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/22 9:57 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ANGELA BUTLER. (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 10/22 11:48 AM
ORDER GRANTING 6 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL. The 6 motion is GRANTED. The Clerk must disconnect Arlene Kline from receipt of CM/ECF notices in this case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/22/2021. (rcb)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 10/22 10:27 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by TELEPERFORMANCE. (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/22 7:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC ANDREW GORDON on behalf of All Defendants (GORDON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 10/19 9:09 AM
DEFENDANT'S RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (GORDON, ERIC) Modified to edit title on 10/19/2021 (rcb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
3 3 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/08 4:44 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Teleperformance. (KLINE, ARLENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
2 2 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/05 12:02 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/19/2021 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/18/2021 . Discovery due by 2/2/2022 . Status Report due by 11/5/2021 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/05/2021. (rcb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 10/04 6:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Teleperformance from IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FOURTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT IN AND FOR WASHINGTON COUNTY, FLORIDA, case number 21-CA-56. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6417719.), filed by Teleperformance. (KLINE, ARLENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 15 pgs Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration in Support of Removal