Doe #1 et al v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Shelly D Dick |
Referred: | Scott D Johnson |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00564 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2021 |
Re-opened: | Oct 31, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 02, 2022 5:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Troy Blanchard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lindsay Madatic
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer Normand
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adelaide Russo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennie Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe #1
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe #2
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe #3
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe #4
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe #5
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe #6
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
96 | 96
motion
Strike
Fri 01/26 12:05 PM
MOTION to Strike 94 Notice of (other), by Jennie Stewart(Phayer, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Support | ||
order
Order on Motion to Strike
Fri 01/26 1:04 PM
ORDER granting96 MOTION to Strike 94 Notice of Supplemental Authority Concerning Motions to Dismiss and Request for Opportunity to Replead (R. Doc. 94). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/26/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
94 | 94
notice
Notice of (other)
Thu 01/25 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Authority by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6(Methvin, Mildred) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Owens v Louisiana State University.2023 WL 2764760, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Owens v Louisiana State University.2023 WL 8880377, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Owens v Louisiana State University.2023 WL 9051299 | ||
93 | 93
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/25 10:11 AM
MOTION for Eleeza Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2701106) by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6(Methvin, Mildred) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Eleeza Johnson, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion | ||
92 | 92
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/25 10:06 AM
MOTION for James R. (Jim) Dunnam to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2701088) by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6(Methvin, Mildred) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Jim Dunnam, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Proposed Order | ||
91 | 91
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/25 10:00 AM
MOTION for Chad W. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2701075) by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6(Methvin, Mildred) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Chad Dunn, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion | ||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Thu 01/25 4:10 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:91 MOTION for Chad W. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2701075),92 MOTION for James R. (Jim) Dunnam to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2701088),93 MOTION for Eleeza Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2701106). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/25 4:33 PM
ORDER granting91 ,92 , and93 Motions for Chad W. Dunn, James R. (Jim) Dunnam, and Eleeza Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/25/2024. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) |