CalPlant I, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-11302
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-11302
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:21-bk-11303 |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 15, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
CalPlant I, LLC
6101 State Highway 162
Willows, CA 95988-9774 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
145 | 145
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Fri 04/19 5:15 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by CalPlant I, LLC. (Keilson, Brya) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
144 | 144
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Thu 04/18 7:01 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Eladio Perez Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 11, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (ET) . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Steele, Benjamin) |
|
143 | 143
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Thu 04/18 12:30 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ishrat Khan Regarding Order Extending the Claims Objection Deadline to September 23, 2024 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Steele, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/15 1:02 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-50692 Closed (MMD) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
142 | 142
claims
Claims Register
Fri 04/12 1:21 PM
Quarterly Claims Register (Alpha) . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
Att: 1 (Numeric) Quarterly Claims Register |