New York Northern District Court
Judge:Frederick J Scullin, Jr
Referred: Christian F Hummel
Case #: 1:21-cv-01084
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2021
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 03, 2022 6:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Chad Brown
Individually c/o 518 Concrete 67 Orchard Street
Canajoharie, NY 13317
Plaintiff
Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By
Jennifer A. Clark
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local 2 Annuity Fund
Represented By
Jennifer A. Clark
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany New York, AFL-CIO
Represented By
Jennifer A. Clark
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Education and Training Fund
Represented By
Jennifer A. Clark
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Health Benefit Fund
Represented By
Jennifer A. Clark
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Pension Fund
Represented By
Jennifer A. Clark
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Construction Employers Association of CNY, Inc..
Represented By
Jennifer A. Clark
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Eastern Contractors Association, Inc..
Represented By
Jennifer A. Clark
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Daniel E. Kornfeld
Blitman & King Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
50 50 notice Notice - Other Fri 02/21 4:21 PM
Tracking Receipt for mailing of the49 Order sent to pro se defendant Chad Brown via certified mail - delivered on January 28, 2025. Related [+]
Related: [-] p