New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Lois H Goodman
Case #: 3:21-cv-18143
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2021
Terminated:Mar 29, 2022
Case in other court:New York Southern, 1:21-mc-00746
Last checked: Sunday Apr 03, 2022 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
STEPHEN A. WIEDER
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Defendant
W.S. CUMBY, INC.
Defendant
STEVEN HOLL ARCHITECTS
Represented By
MARK SEIDEN
Milber Makris Plousadis & Seiden, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
M. COHEN AND SONS, INC.
Represented By
STEPHANIE NOLAN DEVINEY
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
STEVEN J. DAROCI
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/19 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MELANIE E. GETZ on behalf of M. COHEN AND SONS, INC. (GETZ, MELANIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
30 30 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 03/29 12:26 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/29/2022. (abr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Mon 03/28 5:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by M. COHEN AND SONS, INC.. (DAROCI, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
misc Docket Annotation (public) Fri 03/18 10:13 AM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: Please disregard TEXT ORDERS 27 & 28 . (ijf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 03/07 4:58 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 3/7/2022. (ijf, )
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 03/07 5:12 PM
TEXT ORDER directing counsel to submit a joint letter by 3/25/2022 as to whether the new damages claims give rise to a need to amend the complaint, to add a new cause of action or instead relate to discovery and scheduling issues. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/7/2022. (ijf, )
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 03/07 5:18 PM
TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference for 4/22/2022 at 12:30 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide counsel with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/7/2022. (ijf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
order Order Fri 02/25 1:07 PM
TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference for 3/7/2022 at 2:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide counsel with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/25/2022. (ijf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/29 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN A. WIEDER on behalf of PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (WIEDER, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
order Order on Oral Motion Tue 12/21 4:48 PM
TEXT ORDER directing counsel to submit a report on status by 1/24/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/21/2021. (ijf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/20 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK SEIDEN on behalf of STEVEN HOLL ARCHITECTS (abr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 12/21 4:47 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 12/17/2021. (ijf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
order Order on Oral Motion Thu 12/09 2:55 PM
TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference for 12/17/2021 with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide counsel with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/9/2021.(ijf, )
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation (public) Thu 12/09 3:20 PM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Telephone Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman will be held at 1:00 p.m. (ijf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
order Order on Oral Motion Wed 11/17 3:59 PM
TEXT ORDER; any opposition to the Motion to Compel Steven Holl Architects to comply with Subpoena2 should be filed within 14 days from the entry of the order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/17/2021. (ijf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/22 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. DAROCI on behalf of M. COHEN AND SONS, INC. (DAROCI, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/12 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR on behalf of M. COHEN AND SONS, INC. (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/06 1:33 PM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
18 18 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-mc-00746. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
17 17 ORDER granting13 Motion to Transfer Case. It is hereby ORDERED that MCS 's Motion is GRANTED, and this action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, which is the Court that issued the subpoena in the related matter captioned M. Cohen and Sons, Inc. v. Platte River Insurance Co., C.A. 3 :20-cv-02149 ZNQ-LHG. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/28/21) (yv) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
Related: [-]
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey.(yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 15 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
16 16 AFFIRMATION of Barry J. Muller in Support re:13 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc...(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
15 15 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc.. Related Document Number:13 ..(Muller, Barry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
Related: [-]
14 14 5 pgs MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc...(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc.. Return Date set for 9/24/2021 at 09:00 AM..(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
12 12 ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/13/21) (yv)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines as to2 AMENDED MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Steven Holl Architects to Comply With Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of New Jersey. Other Court Case Number: 3:20-cv-02149. ( Responses due by 9/16/2021 ) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
11 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Mark Seiden dated September 10, 2021. Document filed by Steven Holl Architects..(Seiden, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
10 10 MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
9 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc...(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
8 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Compel and Supporting Documents served on Steven Holl Architects on September 9, 2021. Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc...(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
7 7 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc.. Related Document Number:2 ..(Muller, Barry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
Related: [-]
6 6 DECLARATION of Barry J. Muller in Support re:2 AMENDED MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Steven Holl Architects to Comply With Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of New Jersey. Other Court Case Number: 3:20-cv-02149.. Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc...(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
5 5 20 pgs MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:2 AMENDED MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Steven Holl Architects to Comply With Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of New Jersey. Other Court Case Number: 3:20-cv-02149. . Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc...(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
4 4 DECLARATION of Allen Cohen in Support re:2 AMENDED MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Steven Holl Architects to Comply With Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of New Jersey. Other Court Case Number: 3:20-cv-02149.. Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc...(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
3 3 DECLARATION of Corinne McCann Trainor in Support re:2 AMENDED MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Steven Holl Architects to Comply With Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of New Jersey. Other Court Case Number: 3:20-cv-02149.. Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc...(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F, G, H,
Att: 7 Exhibit I
2 2 AMENDED MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Steven Holl Architects to Comply With Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of New Jersey. Other Court Case Number: 3:20-cv-02149. Return Date set for 9/21/2021 at 09:00 AM.Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc..(Muller, Barry)
Related: [-]
1 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Steven Holl Architects to Comply With Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of New Jersey. Other Court Case Number: 3:20-cv-02149. (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-25037986) Return Date set for 9/21/2021 at 09:00 AM.Document filed by M. Cohen and Sons, Inc..(Muller, Barry) Modified on 9/9/2021 (wb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Corinne Trainor,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F, G, H,
Att: 8 Exhibit I,
Att: 9 Declaration of Allen Cohen,
Att: 10 Brief,
Att: 11 Certification of Good Faith,
Att: 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement,
Att: 13 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 14 Certification of Service
Case Designated ECF. (wb)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Barry J. Muller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: STEVEN HOLL ARCHITECTS. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (wb)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Barry J. Muller. Attorney must electronically file the Miscellaneous Cover Sheet. Use the event type Miscellaneous Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT MISCELLANEOUS PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Barry J. Muller to RE-FILE Document No. 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Steven Holl Architects to Comply With Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of New Jersey. Other Court Case Number: 3:20-cv-02149. (Filing Fee $. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): All supporting documents are filed separately.;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Motion to Compel found under the event list Miscellaneous Case Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers.. (wb) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
Related: [-]
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(wb)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 7 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
Related: [-]