Umbehr v. Allstate
Original Case: 4:21-cv-01643
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-20543 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 23, 2021 2:28 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kevin Umbehr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Falethesa Umbehr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/23/2021 2:28 AM CST |
Wednesday, October 06, 2021 | ||
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Falethesa Umbehr and Mr. Kevin Umbehr 21-20543 (RLL) |