Original Case: 1:20-cv-03346

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cvpri-07108
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2021
Terminated:Aug 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2023 4:44 AM EDT
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Americans United for Life
Represented By
Samuel Joseph Salario Jr.
Lawson Huck Gonzalez, PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Susan B. Anthony List
Represented By
Jacob Phillips
Normand PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
District of Columbia
Represented By
Loren L. AliKhan
Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia
contact info
Carl James Schifferle
Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia
contact info
Caroline S. Van Zile
Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia
contact info
Ashwin Pradyumna Phatak
Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Frederick Douglass Foundation, Inc.
Represented By
John Joseph Bursch
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Jacob P. Warner
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Kevin Theriot
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Erin Morrow Hawley
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Elissa Graves
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Students for Life of America
Represented By
John Joseph Bursch
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Jacob P. Warner
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Kevin Theriot
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Erin Morrow Hawley
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Elissa Graves
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
William Cleveland
Represented By
John Joseph Bursch
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Jacob P. Warner
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Kevin Theriot
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Erin Morrow Hawley
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Elissa Graves
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert L. Gurley, Jr.
Represented By
John Joseph Bursch
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Jacob P. Warner
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Kevin Theriot
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Erin Morrow Hawley
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Elissa Graves
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Angela Tina Whittington
Represented By
John Joseph Bursch
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Jacob P. Warner
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Kevin Theriot
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Erin Morrow Hawley
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Elissa Graves
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info

GPO Aug 15 2023
OPINION [2012552] filed (Pages: 39) for the Court by Judge Rao, OPINION CONCURRING IN THE JUDGMENT (Pages: 3) by Judge Wilkins. [21-7108]

Docket last updated: 08/16/2023 4:44 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 21-7108
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1917045] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-03346-JEB filed by William Cleveland, Frederick Douglass Foundation, Inc., Robert L. Gurley, Jr., Students for Life of America and Angela Tina Whittington. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7108 21-7108
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1917047] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/05/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 11/05/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/05/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/05/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/05/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 11/05/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/05/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/05/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/22/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 11/05/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/05/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/05/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/22/2021 21-7108
Related: [-]