Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-22155

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 2:21-ap-06043
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2021
Terminated:Jan 14, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Triumph Commercial Finance, LLC
Represented By
Triumph Commercial Finance, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Stolte, Liquidating Agent of Emporia Property Group, LLC, Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Sharon L. Stolte
Sandberg Phoenix & Von Gontard
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Friday, January 14, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/14 12:59 PM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-6043 Closed . (kjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
5 5 notice Generic Notice Wed 12/29 9:20 AM
Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice. Filed by Plaintiff Sharon Stolte, Liquidating Agent of Emporia Property Group, LLC, Liquidating Trust . (Stolte, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 11, 2021
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/11 9:13 AM
Summons Service Executed on Triumph Commercial Finance, LLC 10/8/2021 (Stolte, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 10/08 9:26 AM
Summons Issued on Triumph Commercial Finance, LLC Date Issued 10/8/2021, Answer Due 11/8/2021 . (ktb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
2 2 cmp Summons Request Thu 10/07 9:42 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Sharon L. Stolte on behalf of Sharon Stolte, Liquidating Agent of Emporia Property Group, LLC, Liquidating Trust - summons(es) requested on Triumph Commercial Finance, LLC (Stolte, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/06 4:10 PM
Adversary case 21-06043 Complaint by Sharon L. Stolte on behalf of Sharon Stolte, Liquidating Agent of Emporia Property Group, LLC, Liquidating Trust against Triumph Commercial Finance, LLC. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Stolte, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Transfer Amounts