Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-01542

Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Marian F Harrison
Case #: 1:21-ap-90144
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2021
Terminated:Feb 22, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
LOGUE'S AUTO SALES INC
1605 CARMACK BLVD
COLUMBIA, TN 38401
Represented By
LOGUE'S AUTO SALES INC
contact info
Defendant
VICTOR DESHAWN BENDERMON
PO BOX 1792
COLUMBIA, TN 38402
Represented By
FLEXER LAW PLLC
contact info
Defendant
TANTONIA SHEREA BENDERMON
PO BOX 1792
COLUMBIA, TN 38402
Represented By
FLEXER LAW PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND, III
OFFICE OF THE CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE PO BOX 340019
NASHVILLE, TN 37203
Represented By
JAMES M DAVIS
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:09 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/22 10:14 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-90144 Closed . (kmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 12/22 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 12/22/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment - AP Order
Monday, December 20, 2021
13 13 order Default Judgment - AP Order Mon 12/20 2:31 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff/Trustee's Motion For Default Judgment against Defendants Logue's Auto Sales, Inc., Victor Deshawn Bendermon, and Tantonia Sherea Bendermon Related [+], BY THE COURT: Judge Marian F. Harrison. (kmw)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #6
Friday, December 17, 2021
12 12 misc Submitted Order Fri 12/17 9:38 AM
Submitted Order for Default Judgment Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III Related [+]. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
11 11 court Receipt of Filing Fee(OTC auto) Tue 12/07 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 627128. (admin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 21, 2021
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 11/21 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 11/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Docket Order
Friday, November 19, 2021
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 11/19 12:20 PM
ENTRY of Default by U.S. Bankruptcy Court Clerk against Logue's Auto Sales, Inc., Victor Deshawn Bendermon and Tantonia Sherea Bendermon. Related [+] (Intake3)
Related: [-] 4 Motion Requesting Entry of Default from Clerk - AP Motion
8 8 virtual 10. Docket Order - Add Text. Fri 11/19 8:19 AM
ORDER by Judge Harrison : With regard to docket entry #6 ,7 , the PDFs contain incorrect hearing information. If a timely objection is filed to the Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, the hearing will take place on 1/21/2022 at 09:00 AM; via Zoom video for Columbia only, as indicated in the docket entry. Related [+] (jjk)
Related: [-] 6 ,7
Thursday, November 18, 2021
7 7 notice Generic Notice - AP Notice Thu 11/18 11:27 AM
Amended LBR 9013 Notice (correcting the year of the "if response" hearing date) Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III Related [+]. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Default Judgment - AP Motion Thu 11/18 10:24 AM
Motion for Default Judgment . If timely response hearing will be held 1/21/2022 at 09:00 AM; via Zoom video for Columbia; For details please see www.tnmb.uscourts.gov. Responses due by 12/9/2021. Certificate of Service Mailed on 11/18/2021. Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Submitted Entry of Default (Clerk's signature) Thu 11/18 10:21 AM
Submitted Entry of Default for entry by the Clerk Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III Related [+]. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 motion Entry of Default - Clerk - AP Motion Thu 11/18 10:21 AM
Motion Requesting Entry of Default from Clerk in Adversary Proceeding. Certificate of Service mailed on 11/18/2021. Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed - AP Fri 10/08 7:36 AM
Summons Service Executed on Defendant TANTONIA SHEREA BENDERMON 10/8/2021; VICTOR DESHAWN BENDERMON 10/8/2021; LOGUE'S AUTO SALES INC 10/8/2021. Filed on the behalf of: HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conf Fri 10/08 7:17 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service on TANTONIA SHEREA BENDERMON ; VICTOR DESHAWN BENDERMON ; LOGUE'S AUTO SALES INC. Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 11/24/2021 at 01:15 PMRefer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details on the remote meeting. Pretrial Conference will be conducted telephonically via Zoom Audio. The call-in information is as follows: Zoom Call-In Number 833-568-8864; Meeting ID 160 2983 9352. Related [+] (jjk)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, October 07, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/07 9:10 AM
Adversary case 1:21-ap-90144. Complaint by HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III against LOGUE'S AUTO SALES INC, VICTOR DESHAWN BENDERMON, TANTONIA SHEREA BENDERMON. Fee Amount is $350.00. Filed By Trustee, Fees will be deferred. HENRY EDWARD HILDEBRAND III. Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (HILDEBRAND, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 4