Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Case #: 0:21-cv-62094
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:0501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2021
Terminated:Jun 01, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 05, 2022 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Millionaire's Concierge Inc.
P.O. Box 6327 c/o Secretary of State
Tallahassee, FL 32314
Plaintiff
Alex Evers
Represented By
Joel Benjamin Rothman
Sriplaw, PLLC
contact info
Craig Anthony Wirth
Sriplaw
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Serio
Represented By
Joel Benjamin Rothman
Sriplaw, PLLC
contact info
Craig Anthony Wirth
Sriplaw
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Douglas Turner
Terminated: 02/09/2022


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Monday, June 06, 2022
22 22 order Judgment - Default Permanent Injunction Mon 06/06 12:17 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Alex Evers, Scott Serio against Millionaire's Concierge Inc., PERMANENT INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 06/02 9:26 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Final Default Judgment. Judgment for Plaintiffs will be entered separately. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 06/02 9:28 AM
Civil Case Closed per DE21 . (pes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
20 20 motion Default Judgment Thu 04/21 4:37 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Alex Evers, Scott Serio.(Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joel B. Rothman in Support of Motion for Final Default,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Invoice,
Att: 3 Declaration of Scott Serio,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 - Certificates,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 01, 2022
19 19 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 04/04 10:44 AM
ORDER on Final Default Procedures. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
18 18 order Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Thu 03/24 2:40 PM
Clerks Entry of Default as to Millionaire's Concierge Inc. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/24/2022. (kpe)
Related: [-]
notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks Thu 03/24 2:34 PM
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 16 Clerks Notice. Clerks Notice Entered In Error by Clerk. Document 16 restricted and modified. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
order Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Wed 03/23 4:03 PM
Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Millionaire's Concierge Inc. Reason: Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed OR Waiver of Service Executed - has NOT been entered on docket. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/23/2022. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
15 15 motion Clerks Entry of Default Tue 03/22 5:35 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Millionaire's Concierge Inc. by Alex Evers, Scott Serio.(Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Craig A. Wirth in Support of Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 02/10 10:08 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case as to Party Douglas Turner with prejudice - case remains open as to Millionaire's Concierge, Inc. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Tue 02/08 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal on Defendant Douglas Turner by Alex Evers, Scott Serio (Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 02/07 3:07 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service as to Millionaire's Concierge Inc. by Alex Evers, Scott Serio. (Wirth, Craig) Modified text on 2/7/2022 (kpe)
Related: [-]
notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 02/07 4:17 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re11 Summons Returned Executed. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was corrected and modified as an Acknowledgment of Service. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 01/24 9:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Millionaire's Concierge Inc.. (kpe)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 01/24 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Millionaire's Concierge Inc.. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 01/21 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Alex Evers, Scott Serio (Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/13 5:33 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Alex Evers, Scott Serio (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 10/13 3:50 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (jao)
Related: [-]
order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Wed 10/13 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/13/2021. (eca)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
4 4 misc Form AO 120/121 Fri 10/08 10:17 AM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (jao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 10/08 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Millionaire's Concierge Inc., Douglas Turner. (jao)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/07 6:07 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement - Injunctive Relief Demanded against Millionaire's Concierge Inc., Douglas Turner. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15077086, filed by Alex Evers, Scott Serio.(Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Registration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summon(s),
Att: 6 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 10/08 9:44 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
Related: [-]