California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-02620
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2021
Last checked: Friday Oct 08, 2021 12:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Angel Daniel Jacobo (1)
Represented By
Roxana Sandoval
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Schulberg
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Sep 26 2024
JUDGMENT as to Angel Daniel Jacobo (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of the BOP: 42 months; Supervised Release; 3 Years; Penalty Assessment: $100 at $25 per quarter through the IFRP; Fine: Waived. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. (rfm)

Docket last updated: 10/08/2021 1:32 AM PDT
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
Arrest of Angel Daniel Jacobo (no document attached) (aef) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Angel Daniel Jacobo.(aef) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Angel Daniel Jacobo: Initial Appearance set for 9/8/2021 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (mme) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
3 3 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Angel Daniel Jacobo. (tkl) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to Angel Daniel Jacobo held on 9/8/2021. Defendant consents to VTC. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Angel Daniel Jacobo. Bond set as to Angel Daniel Jacobo (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA. Defense counsel request for defendant to be released today is granted. Defendant to remain in the custody of Ramona Jacobo until bond packet is submitted and approved by the Court. Defendant must submit bond packet by 9/15/21. Abstract issued. Rule 5 advisement provided. (Preliminary Hearing set for 9/21/21 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 10/05/21 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. ) (CD# 9/8/2021 AHG 21-1:2:21-2:52). (Plaintiff Attorney Francisco Nagel AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Brittany Sherron FD-S/A). (aje) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Angel Daniel Jacobo (no document attached) (aje) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Angel Daniel Jacobo (ekb - ADI) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Angel Daniel Jacobo (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/07/2021. (ekb - ADI) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Angel Daniel Jacobo: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/8/21. (aje) (ggv). [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jessica Schulberg appearing for USA. (Schulberg, Jessica)Attorney Jessica Schulberg added to party USA(pty:pla) (axc) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Roxana Sandoval appearing for Angel Daniel Jacobo (Sandoval, Roxana)Attorney Roxana Sandoval added to party Angel Daniel Jacobo(pty:dft) (smy1) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
11 11 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Angel Daniel Jacobo (Sandoval, Roxana) (ggv) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
12 12 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING (JUDGE/TIME) as to Defendant Angel Daniel Jacobo. On the Court's own motion, Preliminary Hearing RESET for 9/21/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (dls) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
13 13 PS Bond Filed as to Angel Daniel Jacobo in amount of $ $10,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (Document applicable to USA, Angel Daniel Jacobo.) (ekb) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
14 14 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Angel Daniel Jacobo. Preliminary Hearing continued to 10/5/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 9/20/2021. (acc) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
15 15 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Schulberg, Jessica) (fth). [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
16 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Angel Daniel Jacobo. Arraignment set for 10/5/2021 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/5/2021 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (tkl) [3:21-mj-03672-AHG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
17 17 INFORMATION as to Angel Daniel Jacobo (1) count(s) 1. (sxa) (dlg).
Related: [-]
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Arraignment on Information as to Angel Daniel Jacobo (1) (present on bond) Count 1 held on 10/5/2021. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 11/10/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. (CD# 10/5/2021 9:29-9:33). (Plaintiff Attorney S/A Julie Bauman, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney S/A Armilla Staley-Ngomo FD for Roxanna Sandoval, FD). (tkl)
Related: [-]