Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:21-cv-04986
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2021
Terminated:Oct 21, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
William R. Barker
110 W. Brown Street
New Lexington, OH 43765
Represented By
Daniel T Downey
Fishel, Hass, Kim & Albrecht Downey, LLP
contact info
Jennifer Henderson George
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff LLP
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Andrew Love
110 W. Brown Street
New Lexington, OH 43765
Represented By
Daniel T Downey
Fishel, Hass, Kim & Albrecht Downey, LLP
contact info
Jennifer Henderson George
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff LLP
contact info
Defendant
Perry County Sheriff Department
110 W. Brown Street
New Lexington, OH 43765
Represented By
Daniel T Downey
Fishel, Hass, Kim & Albrecht Downey, LLP
contact info
Jennifer Henderson George
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Anders
264 Drinley Drive
Zanesville, OH 43701
Represented By
Miles Douglas Fries
Gottlieb, Johnston, Beam & Dal Ponte
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, October 21, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/21 8:30 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Heather Anders (Fries, Miles)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/21 8:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Heather Anders (Fries, Miles)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 10/25 3:47 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/12 12:19 PM
MOTION for Order for Immediate Return of Personal Property by Plaintiff Heather Anders. (er)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 10/12 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT filed originally in Perry County Court of Common Pleas on 9/29/2021 by Heather Anders against William R. Barker, Deputy Andrew Love & Perry County Sheriff Department. (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/08 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Perry County Common Pleas Court, case number 21-CV-00215 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8534654), filed by Deputy Andrew Love, William R. Barker, Perry County Sheriff Department. (Downey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet