Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Case #: 1:21-cv-00509
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Property Damage (P.I
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2021
Terminated:Jun 28, 2022
Case in other court:Jefferson County District Clerk, A208298
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Joshua Story
Defendant
Lighthouse Property Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Ronald Lynn Hornback
The Monson Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Mid-America Catastrophe Services, LLC
Defendant
Pharos Claims Service, LLC
Plaintiff
Suzanne Devillier
Represented By
Ryan Matthew Schaper
Schaper Law Firm, PLLC
contact info

GPO May 23 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the case be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction re 4 MOTION to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 5/23/22. (kcv, )
GPO Jun 08 2022
ORDER adopting the 15 Report and Recommendation. This case is REMANDED to the 58th Judicial Court of Jefferson County, Texas for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/8/22. (kcv, )

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, July 18, 2022
17 17 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Mon 07/18 2:59 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by the 58th JDC, Jefferson County as to certified copies of the16 Order of Remand and docket sheet on 7/11/22. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
utility Remark Tue 06/28 1:27 PM
Remark: Certified copy of Docket sheet and Order of Remand forwarded to the 58th JDC, Jefferson County via USPS. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Wed 06/08 4:13 PM
ORDER adopting the15 Report and Recommendation. This case is REMANDED to the 58th Judicial Court of Jefferson County, Texas for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/8/22. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
15 15 misc Report and Recommendations Tue 05/24 11:01 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the case be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction re4 MOTION to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 5/23/22. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
14 14 3 pgs order Order Fri 04/29 3:19 PM
ORDER TO AMEND NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Within ten (10) days of the date of this order, Lighthouse shall amend its notice of removal to "distinctly and affirmatively allege" the citizenship of all parties to this lawsuit. The failure to do so may result in the remand of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/29/22. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/29 4:35 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Court Approval of Stipulation Regarding Expert Designation Deadlines. Plaintiff's designation of expert witnesses and reports are now due May 27, 2022. Defendants' designation of expert witnesses and reports are now due July 8, 2022. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/29/22. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/28 1:12 PM
Joint MOTION Approval of Stipulation Regarding Expert Deadlines by Suzanne Devillier.(Schaper, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 07, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Mon 03/07 11:40 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION. The Plaintiff's4 Motion to Remand is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn for consideration and disposition. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/7/22. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/16 4:59 PM
ORDER granting the9 Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline. The mediation deadline is extended to March 25, 2022. All remaining deadlines in the Courts8 Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/16/22. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/15 2:54 PM
Joint MOTION Extend Mediation Deadline by Suzanne Devillier.(Schaper, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 18, 2021
8 8 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/19 8:38 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/3/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale.. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/18/2021. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 11/22 9:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2021. Attorneys Present: Ryan Schaper, Ronald Hornback. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
7 7 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 11/12 12:16 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Schaper, Ryan) (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 (11/12/2021) Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order
Thursday, November 04, 2021
6 6 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 11/04 1:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Remand filed by Lighthouse Property Insurance Corporation .(Hornback, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Insurance Policy,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 14, 2021
5 5 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/15 9:40 AM
ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by November 1, 2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 03:00 PM in Room 221 before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/14/21. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
4 4 motion Remand Wed 10/13 12:06 PM
MOTION to Remand by Suzanne Devillier.(Schaper, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Tue 10/12 9:59 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/12 9:59 AM
ORIGINAL ANSWER filed in State Court and included in Notice of Removal, to2 Original Petition, by Lighthouse Property Insurance Corporation.(kcv, )
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 10/12 9:57 AM
ORIGINAL PETITION filed in State Court and included in Notice of Removal, against Lighthouse Property Insurance Corporation, Mid-America Catastrophe Services, LLC, Pharos Claims Service, LLC, Joshua Story, filed by Suzanne Devillier.(kcv, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/08 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lighthouse Property Insurance from Jefferson County District Court, case number A208298. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8618397), filed by Lighthouse Property Insurance.(Hornback, Ronald) (Attachment 9 replaced on 10/8/2021 with flattened image) (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal,
Att: 3 Exhibit Citation for Lighthouse,
Att: 4 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit Lighthouse's Original Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit Lighthouse's Motion to Dismiss Agents,
Att: 7 Exhibit Index of Matters Filed,
Att: 8 Exhibit List of All Parties and Counsel of Record,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/12 9:46 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 10/12 9:55 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (kcv, )
Related: [-]