Oregon District Court
Judge:Stacie F Beckerman
Case #: 3:21-cv-01480
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2021
Terminated:Jan 27, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 2:08 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Christophe Esayian
Represented By
Kristine M. Lambert
Buchanan Angeli Altschul & Sullivan
contact info
Courtney Angeli
Buchanan Angeli Altschul & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Lloyd Burke
Represented By
B. Scott Whipple
Whipple Law Office, LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Oregon International Air Freight Co.
Represented By
Philip M. Guess
K&l Gates Llp (seattle)
contact info
Elizabeth H. White
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Alicia J. LeDuc
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
OIA Global Logistics-SCM Inc.
Represented By
Philip M. Guess
K&l Gates Llp (seattle)
contact info
Elizabeth H. White
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Alicia J. LeDuc
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
William Yankow
Represented By
Jamison R. McCune
Bodyfelt Mount, LLP
contact info
Matthew C. Miller
Weston Hurd LLP
contact info
Defendant
Todd Sweeney
Represented By
Henry Brudney
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Charles W Hamilton, II
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Jason A. Rittereiser
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mike Rizzo
Represented By
Joseph James Haddad
Jjh Law, PC
contact info
Defendant
Raul Lucena
2911 n. Newcastle
Chicago, IL 60634
Defendant
Michael Lehnert
Defendant
Kimberly Komacki
Represented By
Martin B. Carroll
Fox Swibel Levin & Carroll LLP
contact info
James M. Barrett
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart P.C.
contact info
David J Ogles
Fox Swibel Levin & Carroll
contact info
Defendant
Christophe Esayian
Represented By
Kristine M. Lambert
Buchanan Angeli Altschul & Sullivan
contact info
Courtney Angeli
Buchanan Angeli Altschul & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-20
Defendant
Oliver Burke
Defendant
Lloyd Burke
Represented By
B. Scott Whipple
Whipple Law Office, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Marie Bovey
Represented By
Joseph James Haddad
Jjh Law, PC
contact info
Alina Salo
Jjh Law, PC
contact info
Movant
Masterpiece International, Ltd.
Represented By
Jason E. Hirshon
Slinde Nelson Stanford
contact info
Plaintiff
OIA Global Logistics-SCM Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Heather White
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Philip M. Guess
K&l Gates Llp (seattle)
contact info
Elizabeth H. White
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Alicia J. LeDuc
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Oregon International Air Freight Co.
Represented By
Elizabeth Heather White
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Philip M. Guess
K&l Gates Llp (seattle)
contact info
Elizabeth H. White
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Alicia J. LeDuc
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Heidi Bassano
Terminated: 01/11/2022

GPO May 16 2022
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons stated, the Court recommends that the district judge DENY Lucena's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (ECF No. 54). Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 5/31/2022. Signed on 5/16/2022 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
GPO Jun 08 2022
ORDER - No party having made objections, this Court follows the recommendation of the Advisory Committee and reviews Judge Beckerman's Findings and Recommendation for clear error on the face of the record. No such error is apparent. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS Judge Beckerman's Findings and Recommendation, ECF 110. The Court DENIES Defendant Luceno's motion to dismiss, ECF 54. Signed on 6/8/2022 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Main Document 112 replaced on 6/8/2022) (cw).

Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Friday, January 27, 2023
132 132 oth_doc Stipulation Fri 01/27 12:40 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Guess, Philip)
Related: [-]
order Dismissal -Terminate Case Fri 01/27 2:09 PM
ORDER. Pursuant to the Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice (ECF No.132 ), this case is DISMISSED as of 1/27/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]